EP1429753 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING GAMMA-BUTYROBETAINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kalvinsh, Ivars Libieshu 25 5052 Ikshkile / LV | For all designated states Veveris, Maris Apartment 20, Vejavas iela 10/2 1035 Riga / LV | For all designated states Birmans, Anatolijs Hospitalu 8-35 1013 Riga / LV | [2007/01] |
Former [2004/26] | For all designated states Kalvinsh, Ivars Libieshu 25 5052 Ikshkile / LV | ||
For all designated states Veveris, Maris Apartment 20, Vejavas iela 10/2 1035 Riga / LV | |||
For all designated states Birmans, Anatolijs Hospitalu 8-35 1013 Riga / LV | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/26] | Representative(s) | Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/26] | Madgwick, Paul Roland, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN BECKER, Pienzenauerstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02702955.2 | 04.03.2002 | [2004/26] | WO2002LV00004 | Priority number, date | LV20010000134 | 07.09.2001 Original published format: LV 010134 | [2004/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03022262 | Date: | 20.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1429753 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1429753 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/205, A61K31/519, A61K31/4985, A61P15/10 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/205 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/26] | A61K31/205, A61K31/519, A61K31/4985, A61P15/00, A61P15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/26] | Extension states | AL | 05.04.2004 | LT | 05.04.2004 | LV | Not yet paid | MK | 05.04.2004 | RO | 05.04.2004 | SI | 05.04.2004 | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND GAMMA-BUTYROBETAIN | [2004/26] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING GAMMA-BUTYROBETAINE | [2004/26] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE CONTENANT DE LA GAMMA-BUTYROBETAINE | [2004/26] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 16.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.01.2007 | LU | 04.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/33] | CY | 03.01.2007 | |
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | MC | 31.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4382092 (CAVAZZA CLAUDIO [IT]) [X] 2 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]WO9706795 (KALVINSH IVARS [LV], et al) [X] 2 * claims 1-10 *; | [X]WO9706794 (KALVINSH IVARS [LV], et al) [X] 2,3* claims 1-10 * |