EP1383466 - COSMETIC AND PERFUME PRODUCTS WITH AMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fabryka Kosmetykow "Pollena-Ewa" S.A. ul. 6 Sierpnia 15/17 pl-90-616 Lodz / PL | [2004/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAWLAK, Krzysztof ul. Kasowa 4 m.4 PL-93-173 Lodz / PL | 02 /
KILIAN, Henryka ul. Konstytucyjna 9 PL-90-155 Lodz / PL | 03 /
MACIERZYNSKA, Ewa ul. Bulgarska 8a PL-93-364 Lodz / PL | 04 /
KACZMARSKA, Hanna ul. Piotrkowska 247 PL-90-456 Lodz / PL | 05 /
WIEJACKA, Jadwiga ul. Elsnera 9 PL-92-504 Lodz / PL | 06 /
KASZCZYK, Grazyna ul. Dworcowa 2 a PL-91-120 Galkow Duzy / PL | 07 /
KWIECINSKA, Danuta ul. Bardowskiego 52 PL-91-084 Lodz / PL | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte P.O. Box 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/05] | Teipel, Susanne, Dr. Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02702998.2 | 14.03.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002PL00021 | Priority number, date | PL20010347279 | 24.04.2001 Original published format: PL 34727901 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02085314 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1383466 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/00, A61K7/46 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
A61Q13/00 (EP);
A61K8/965 (EP);
A61K2800/28 (EP);
A61Q1/02 (EP);
A61Q15/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND PARFUMS ENTHALTEND BERNSTEIN | [2004/05] | English: | COSMETIC AND PERFUME PRODUCTS WITH AMBER | [2004/05] | French: | PRODUITS COSMETIQUES ET PARFUMANTS A BASE D'AMBRE | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 01.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/16] | 10.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2004 | 31.03.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH09227334 ; | [X]EP1062944 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1,2,8,10,11,15 * example 4 *; | [X]US4818747 (GIERSCH WOLFGANG K ET AL) [X] 1,2,10,15 * example 3 *; | [A]JPS54117037 (SEIKEN KAGAKU KK) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09227334 A 19970902 (SAWAGUCHI MAREYOSHI;SHIYOUYAKU KODO RIYOU KENKYUSHO:KK) [X] 1-3,5-7,10,11,15 * abstract * |