EP1352385 - MUSICAL INSTRUMENT AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LATIN PERCUSSION, INC. 160 Belmont Avenue Garfield New Jersey 07026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states LATIN PERCUSSION, INC. 160 Belmont Avenue Garfield, New Jersey 07026 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENHOFFER, Raymond 106 Oak Ridge Road Clifton, NJ 07013 / US | 02 /
SIMONS, Richard 80 Jewell Street Garfield, NJ 07026 / US | 03 /
KROL, Andrzej 274 Robertson Way Lincoln Park, NJ 07004 / US | [2003/42] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/42] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 02703075.8 | 09.01.2002 | [2003/42] | WO2002US00355 | Priority number, date | US20010764482 | 17.01.2001 Original published format: US 764482 | [2003/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02058047 | Date: | 25.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1352385 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G10D13/08 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
G10D13/06 (EP,US);
G10D13/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/22] |
Former [2003/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MUSIKINSTRUMENT UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2003/42] | English: | MUSICAL INSTRUMENT AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [2003/42] | French: | INSTRUMENT DE MUSIQUE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE LE PRODUIRE | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 15.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 30.09.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 03.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/08] | 07.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4362080 (DEARMAS RAMON O) |