EP1350306 - AC-TO-AC POWER CONVERTER WITHOUT A DC LINK CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2006 [2006/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALMAN, Garbor 29422 Whitley Collins Drive Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US | 02 /
HUGGETT, Colin 5202 Paseo Del Pavon Torrance, CA 90505 / US | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02703077.4 | 09.01.2002 | [2003/41] | WO2002US00361 | Priority number, date | US20010759054 | 10.01.2001 Original published format: US 759054 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02056451 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1350306 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/458 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
H02M5/4585 (EP,US);
H02M7/4826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Title | German: | WECHSELSTROM-WECHSELSTROM-LEISTUNGSWANDLER OHNE GLEICHSTROMZWISCHENKREISKONDENSATOR | [2003/41] | English: | AC-TO-AC POWER CONVERTER WITHOUT A DC LINK CAPACITOR | [2003/41] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR DE COURANT ALTERNATIF EN COURANT ALTERNATIF DEPOURVU DE CONDENSATEUR DE LIAISON C.C. | [2003/41] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/04] | 23.08.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4783728 (HOFFMAN DAVID C [US]) [X] 1,8 * figures 2,3 * * column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 53 * * column 9, line 60 - line 64 * * column 13, line 41 - line 56 *; | [A]KR20000032765 ; | [A]US5574636 (LEE FRED C [US], et al) [A] 2 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 22 * * column 6, line 28 - column 7, line 21 *; | [A]US5585708 (RICHARDSON ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 2 * figure 2 * * column 1, line 49 - column 4, line 24 *; | [A]US6166929 (MA DAMING [CA], et al) [A] 2 * column 5, line 55 - line 58 * * column 8, line 22 - line 25 * * column 9, line 35 - line 42 * * claim 6 * | [A] - "Three-phase pulse width modulation involves changing switching points...", DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 14, Database accession no. 2001-134408, XP002238725 & KR20000032765 A 20000615 (LEE HYAN DONG ET AL.) [A] 2 * the whole document * |