EP1404496 - CUTTING MAT HAVING LOCKING MEMBERS AND NONLINEAR EDGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Day International, Inc. 130 West Second Street Dayton, OH 45402 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | For all designated states Day International, Inc. 130 West Second Street Dayton. OH 45402 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELIA, John, Rocco 2 Quail Hollow Drive Arden, NC 28704 / US | 02 /
SHELTON, Jerry 23 Kirstein Road Fairview, NC 28730 / US | [2004/15] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/15] | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al David Keltie Associates Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place London EC4M 7ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 02703103.8 | 10.01.2002 | [2004/15] | WO2002US00663 | Priority number, date | US20010881943 | 15.06.2001 Original published format: US 881943 | [2004/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02102558 | Date: | 27.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1404496 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1404496 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/20 | [2004/15] | CPC: |
B26D7/20 (EP,US);
B26D2007/202 (EP,US);
Y10T83/4841 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9312 (EP,US);
Y10T83/9466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GUMMITUCH MIT VERRIEGELUNGSELEMENTEN UND NICHT GERADLINIGEN KANTEN | [2004/15] | English: | CUTTING MAT HAVING LOCKING MEMBERS AND NONLINEAR EDGES | [2004/15] | French: | PLAQUE DE DECOUPAGE POURVUE D'ELEMENTS DE BLOCAGE ET DE BORDS NON LINEAIRES | [2004/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 19.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Request for further processing for: | 10.10.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 06.10.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.11.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2004 | 31.01.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.02.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2006 | BE | 16.08.2006 | CH | 16.08.2006 | CY | 16.08.2006 | FI | 16.08.2006 | LI | 16.08.2006 | DK | 16.11.2006 | SE | 16.11.2006 | GR | 17.11.2006 | IE | 10.01.2007 | LU | 10.01.2007 | PT | 16.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | [2016/07] |
Former [2009/42] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
CY | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
TR | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
IE | 10.01.2007 | ||
LU | 10.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2009/38] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
CY | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
IE | 10.01.2007 | ||
LU | 10.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
GR | 17.11.2006 | ||
IE | 10.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
IE | 10.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
IE | 10.01.2007 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
IT | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
BE | 16.08.2006 | ||
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
PT | 16.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 16.08.2006 | |
CH | 16.08.2006 | ||
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
DK | 16.11.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CH | 16.08.2006 | |
FI | 16.08.2006 | ||
LI | 16.08.2006 | ||
SE | 16.11.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3522754 (SAUER LOUIS E) [A] 8 * abstract *; | [X]US3885486 (KIRKPATRICK ALAN D, et al) [X] 1-7,9,17-21,23-25 * column 3, line 55 - line 65 * * column 4, line 50 - line 56; figure - *; | [A]US4031600 (WHIGHAM BIDDLE A); | [A]US4073207 (KIRKPATRICK ALAN D) [A] 9 * figure 3 *; | [X]US4378737 (KIRKPATRICK ALAN D) [X] 20 * column 4, line 10 - line 12 * * column 5, line 36 - column 6, line 12; figure - *; | [X]US4848204 (O'CONNOR BARRY J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,17-21,23-25 * column 2, line 48 - line 51 * * column 2, line 32 - line 35 * * column 3, line 15 - line 26 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 58; figure - *; | [X]US5720212 (KIRKPATRICK ALAN D [US]) [X] 20-22 * column 4, line 33 - line 40; figure - *; | [A]US5758560 (FISCUS DONALD L [US]) [A] 6,20-22 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 8 * * column 3, line 15 - line 20 *; | [A]US5906149 (MONTENEGRO CRIADO MANUEL [ES]) [A] 10 * abstract *; | [A]US5916346 (NEAL KENNETH RAY [US]) |