EP1360708 - TOROIDAL INDUCTIVE DEVICES AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buswell, Harrie R. 132 Lorraine Court Berea, KY 40403 / US | [2003/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Wablat, Wolfgang Patentanwalt Dr. Dr. W. Wablat Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Wablat, Wolfgang, Dr.Dr. Patentanwalt, Potsdamer Chaussee 48 14129 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 02703175.6 | 23.01.2002 | [2003/46] | WO2002US01631 | Priority number, date | US20010263638P | 23.01.2001 Original published format: US 263638 P | [2003/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02059914 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1360708 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.04.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/28, H01F27/02, H01F17/06 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
H01F41/022 (EP,US);
H01F27/28 (KR);
H01F27/2823 (EP,US);
H01F3/14 (EP,US);
H01F30/16 (EP,US);
H01F17/06 (EP,US);
H01F27/06 (EP,US);
H01F27/266 (EP,US);
H01F27/2895 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/46] | Extension states | AL | 01.08.2003 | LT | 01.08.2003 | LV | 01.08.2003 | MK | 01.08.2003 | RO | 01.08.2003 | SI | 01.08.2003 | Title | German: | INDUKTIVE TOROIDBAUELEMENTE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2003/46] | English: | TOROIDAL INDUCTIVE DEVICES AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2003/46] | French: | DISPOSITIFS INDUCTIFS TOROIDAUX ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ASSOCIES | [2003/46] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/03] | 02.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4138783 (PORTIER JEAN L) [X] 1,2,4,12,13,18,21,23-26,35 * column 2, lines 1-10 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, lines 7-20,35-50 * * figures 5,6,9,10,15 *; | [A]US4652771 (SPECHT THEODORE R [US], et al) [A] 38-40 * column 1, lines 58-60 * * column 3, lines 6-9 * * column 4, lines 5-8 * * column 4, lines 45-61 * * figures 1,3 *; | [A]US4754180 (KIEDROWSKI JAMES A [US]) [A] 38-40* figure 2 *; | [X]US5400005 (BOBRY HOWARD H [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10,21-26,38-40 * column 1, lines 9-11 * * column 1, lines 17-20 * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 2 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, lines 7-16 * * figure 3 *; | [PX]US6229305 (LOGUE DELMAR L [US]) [PX] 1,2,11,21-23 * column 2, lines 17-36 * * column 3, lines 53-58 * * column 4, lines 57-65 * * figure 4 * | International search | [A]US5400005 (BOBRY HOWARD H [US]); | [A]US4833436 (MARTIN RICHARD W [US], et al); | [A]US4551700 (WALDEMAR ANDERS [SE]); | [A]US4652771 (SPECHT THEODORE R [US], et al); | [A]US5402097 (CHOU DANIEL [TW]); | [A]US6229305 (LOGUE DELMAR L [US]); | [A]US3659336 (HORNE ARTHUR P) |