EP1368192 - SELF-CLOSING RESEALABLE PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finestone, Arnold B. 2400 Presidential Way West Palm Beach Florida 33401 / US | For all designated states Bloch, Gilbert 3349 St. Malo Court Palm Beach Gardens Florida 33410 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Finestone, Arnold B. 2400 Presidential Way West Palm Beach, Florida 33401 / US | ||
For all designated states Bloch, Gilbert 3349 St. Malo Court Palm Beach Gardens, Florida 33410 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Holme, Edvard Holme Patent A/S Valbygårdsvej 33 2500 Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Holme, Edvard Holme Patent A/S, Vesterbrogade 20 1620 Copenhagen V. / DK | Application number, filing date | 02703373.7 | 11.02.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002US04115 | Priority number, date | US20010781181 | 12.02.2001 Original published format: US 781181 | US20010934971 | 21.08.2001 Original published format: US 934971 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02064365 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1368192 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, B32B27/06, B65B9/00, B65B11/00, B65B41/18, B32B23/08, B32B27/10, B32B27/32, B32B27/36 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
B32B29/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/10 (EP,US);
B65D75/30 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1307 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1471 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24736 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2486 (EP,US);
Y10T428/263 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/50] | B32B27/00, B32B27/06, B65B9/00, B65B11/00, B65B41/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTSCHLIESSENDES, WIEDERVERSCHLIESSBARES PAKET | [2003/50] | English: | SELF-CLOSING RESEALABLE PACKAGE | [2003/50] | French: | EMBALLAGE REFERMABLE A FERMETURE AUTOMATIQUE | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 27.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/35] | Request for further processing for: | 12.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0172142 (TEPAK SRL [IT]) [A] 1,20* page 3, paragraphs 1-4; claims 1,3 *; | [X]US4806398 (MARTIN JR LESLIE L [US]) [X] 1,20 * column 6, lines 37-67 *; | [X]US4946720 (OISHI TSUKASA [JP], et al) [X] 1,20 * column 3, line 18 * * column 4, lines 54-66 * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US5851608 (YAMADA KAZUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15,20-26 * column 1, lines 55-61; figures 3,4 * * column 4, lines 6-12 * * column 6, lines 43,44 * * column 4, lines 62-65 * * claim 1 * | International search | [X]US6115999 (ADELMAN ROBERT W [US]); | [X]US4680918 (LOVELL ROBERT C [US]); | [X]US5704481 (LUTZ DAVID [US]); | [X]US6085904 (PERDUE JR HARRY A [US]); | [A]US5595046 (WEDER DONALD E [US]); | [A]US5244702 (FINESTONE ARNOLD B [US], et al); | [A]US6133173 (RIEDEL JOHN E [US], et al); | [A]US6076969 (JAISLE RICHARD FREDERICK [US], et al); | [A]US5655707 (JENSEN KURT D [US]); | [A]US5780150 (BLOCH GILBERT [US], et al); | [A]US5962099 (BLOCH GILBERT [US], et al) |