EP1374577 - DIGITAL VIDEO SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/01] | MULTI VIDEO DEVICE CONTROL AND EXPANSION METHOD AND APPARATUS | ||
[2010/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 1 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/21] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REESE, Daniel, J. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CAMENS, Douglas Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BODELL, Paul Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Bee, Joachim Robert Bosch GmbH Zentralabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Bee, Joachim Robert Bosch GmbH Zentalabteilung Patente Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02703790.2 | 11.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002IB00715 | Priority number, date | US20010819788 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: US 819788 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02080539 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1374577 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1374577 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/765 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H04N5/77 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (KR);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | DIGITALES VIDEO-ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2010/11] | English: | DIGITAL VIDEO SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM | [2010/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE VIDÉO NUMÉRIQUE | [2010/11] |
Former [2004/01] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEURERUNG UND EXPANSION EINES MULTI-VIDEOGERÄTES | ||
Former [2004/01] | MULTI VIDEO DEVICE CONTROL AND EXPANSION METHOD AND APPARATUS | ||
Former [2004/01] | APPAREIL ET DISPOSITIF D'EXPANSION ET DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIFS MULTIVIDEO | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.05.2010 | BE | 26.05.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | DK | 26.05.2010 | FI | 26.05.2010 | IT | 26.05.2010 | NL | 26.05.2010 | SE | 26.05.2010 | TR | 26.05.2010 | GR | 27.08.2010 | ES | 06.09.2010 | PT | 27.09.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
IT | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
NL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
SE | 26.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000278633 ; | [XY]WO9636181 (BAXALL SECURITY LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8,9,12,17-20 * page 8, line 12 - page 21; claims 1-44 * [Y] 6,7,10,11,13-16; | [Y]US5583796 (REESE DANIEL J [US]) [Y] 7 * column 3, line 49 - column 12, line 14 *; | [Y]WO9708896 (SCIENTIFIC ATLANTA [US], et al) [Y] 6 * page 7, line 10 - page 23 *; | [A]EP0895421 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-20* column 3, line 40 - column 14, line 41 *; | [Y]US6011901 (KIRSTEN JEFF P [US]) [Y] 10,11,13-16 * column 8, line 33 - column 38, line 21 *; | [A]US6208379 (OYA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 3, line 39 - column 20, line 44 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010205), vol. 2000, no. 13, & JP2000278633 A 20001006 (VICTOR CO OF JAPAN LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |