EP1364917 - METHOD FOR FABRICATING OPTICAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | For all designated states Minami, Tsutomu 7-1, Oonadai 2-chome Osakasayama-shi Osaka 589-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | ||
For all designated states Minami, Tsutomu 7-1, Oonadai 2-chome Osakasayama-shi, Osaka 589-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINAMI, Tsutomu 7-1, Oonodai 2-chome Osakasayama-shi, Osaka 589-0023 / JP | 02 /
TATSUMISAGO, Masahiro 128-16, Oomino Sakai-shi, Osaka 599-8126 / JP | 03 /
TADANAGA, Kiyoharu c/o Dept. of Applied Materials Science 1-1, Gakuen-cho Sakai-shi, Osaka 599-8531 / JP | 04 /
MATSUDA, Atsunori 12-5, Midorigaokanakamachi Kawachi Nagano-shi, Osaka 586-0082 / JP | 05 /
KAWAZU, Mitsuhiro, Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 06 /
YAMAMOTO, Hiroaki, Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | 07 /
NAKAMURA, Koichiro, Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2004/09] |
Former [2003/48] | 01 /
MINAMI, Tsutomu 7-1, Oonodai 2-chome Osakasayama-shi, Osaka 589-0023 / JP | ||
02 /
TATSUMISAGO, Masahiro 128-16, Oomino Sakai-shi, Osaka 599-8126 / JP | |||
03 /
TADANAGA, Kiyoharu 998-3, Nakamozucho 6-chome Sakai-shi, Osaka 591-8023 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUDA, Atsunori 12-5, Midorigaokanakamachi Kawachi Nagano-shi, Osaka 586-0082 / JP | |||
05 /
KAWAZU, Mitsuhiro, Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | |||
06 /
YAMAMOTO, Hiroaki, Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd. 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | |||
07 /
NAKAMURA, Koichiro, Nippon Sheet Glass Co., Ltd 7-28, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Representative(s) | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02703905.6 | 26.02.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002JP01738 | Priority number, date | JP20010057223 | 01.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001057223 | JP20010288622 | 21.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001288622 | [2003/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02070413 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364917 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C03B8/02, C03B19/12, C03C17/34, G02B3/00, B29D11/00, G02B1/04 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
G02B3/0018 (EP,US);
C03B19/12 (KR);
B29D11/00278 (EP,US);
B29D11/00365 (EP,US);
C03C17/006 (EP,US);
G02B1/041 (EP,US);
G02B1/18 (EP,US);
C03C2217/212 (EP,US);
C03C2217/213 (EP,US);
C03C2217/214 (EP,US);
C03C2217/22 (EP,US);
C03C2217/42 (EP,US);
C03C2217/71 (EP,US);
C03C2217/77 (EP,US);
C03C2218/113 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
G02B1/041, C08L83/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/48] | C03B8/02, C03B19/12, C03C17/34, G02B3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/37] |
Former [2003/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG OPTISCHER ELEMENTE | [2003/48] | English: | METHOD FOR FABRICATING OPTICAL ELEMENT | [2003/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT OPTIQUE | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2002 | Translation filed | 14.11.2002 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2002 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 17.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 19.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02164731 ; | [A]JPH06242303 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900913), vol. 014, no. 427, Database accession no. (C - 0758), & JP02164731 A 19900625 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941129), vol. 018, no. 627, Database accession no. (P - 1834), & JP06242303 A 19940902 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-4,7-9,11-13 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2000227506 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000199805 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [YP]JP2001109091 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD); | [Y]EP0985510 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US5378585 (WATANABE HISASHI [JP]) |