EP1375525 - METHOD FOR PREPARING HOLLOW POLYMER PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/01] | HOLLOW POLYMER PARTICLES, METHOD FOR PREPARING HOLLOW POLYMER PARTICLES, POROUS CERAMIC FILTER, AND METHOD FOR PREPARING POROUS CERAMIC FILTER | ||
[2016/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.11.2018 [2018/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-4, Nishitenma 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | For all designated states Tokuyama Sekisui Co., Ltd. 2-4-4, Nishitemma, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8565 / JP | [2017/51] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-4, Nishitenma 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8565 / JP | ||
For all designated states Tokuyama Sekisui Co., Ltd. 2-4-4, Nishitemma, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8565 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OHMURA, Takahiro c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP | 02 /
NAKATA, Yasushi c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 2-4-4, Nishitemma Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8565 / JP | 03 /
KAWAGUCHI, Yasuhiro c/o TOKUYAMA SEKISUI CO., LTD. 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP | 04 /
YOSHIDA, Takahiro c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1259, Izumi Minakuchi-cho Koga-gun, Shiga 528-8585 / JP | [2017/51] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
OHMURA, Takahiro, c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKATA, Yasushi, c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 2-4-4, Nishitemma, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8565 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWAGUCHI, Yasuhiro, c/o TOKUYAMA SEKISUI CO. LTD. 4560, Kaisei-cho Shinnanyo-shi, Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP | |||
04 /
YOSHIDA, Takahiro, c/o SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 1259, Izumi, Minakuchi-cho Koga-gun, Shiga 528-8585 / JP | Representative(s) | Bailey, Jennifer Ann, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [2017/51] |
Former [2012/46] | Brewer, Michael Robert, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 20 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1QZ / GB | ||
Former [2010/22] | Lees, Kate Jane, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1RQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/39] | Hillier, Peter Marks & Clerk 27 Imperial Square Cheltenham GL50 1RQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/01] | Hillier, Peter Edward Evans Barker Clifford's Inn Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 02703979.1 | 12.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002JP02320 | Priority number, date | JP20010072354 | 14.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001072354 | [2004/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02072671 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1375525 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1375525 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.12.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/20, C04B35/195, C04B38/06, C08F2/18 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
C04B38/0655 (EP,US);
C08F2/18 (EP,KR,US);
B01D39/2068 (EP,US);
C04B35/195 (EP,US);
C04B38/06 (EP,US);
C08J3/128 (EP,US);
C08J9/20 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00793 (EP,US);
C08J2483/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249958 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2993 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B38/0655, C04B35/00, C04B38/067 (US,EP);
C04B38/0655, C04B35/195, C04B38/0054, C04B38/067 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2016/11] | C04B35/195, C04B38/06 | ||
Former IPC [2004/01] | C08F2/18 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2017/51] |
Former [2005/02] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOHLEN POLYMERTEILCHEN | [2017/01] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING HOLLOW POLYMER PARTICLES | [2017/01] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DES PARTICULES POLYMERES CREUSES | [2017/01] |
Former [2004/01] | HOHLE POLYMERTEILCHEN, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HOHLEN POLYMERTEILCHEN, PORÖSES KERAMIKFILTER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PORÖSEN KERAMIKFILTERS | ||
Former [2004/01] | HOLLOW POLYMER PARTICLES, METHOD FOR PREPARING HOLLOW POLYMER PARTICLES, POROUS CERAMIC FILTER, AND METHOD FOR PREPARING POROUS CERAMIC FILTER | ||
Former [2004/01] | PARTICULES POLYMERES CREUSES, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DESDITES PARTICULES, FILTRE CERAMIQUE POREUX ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DUDIT FILTRE | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2003 | Translation filed | 29.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 15.10.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, NL | 15.03.2005 | Observations by third parties | 28.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.12.2016 | 07.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3615972 (MOREHOUSE DONALD S JR, et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 11, line 22 - line 24 * * column 12, line 47 - line 61 * * column 3, line 43 - line 58 * * column 4, line 9 - line 17 * * column 4, line 38 - line 44 * * example 1 * * claims 14,15,17,19,46,47 * * example 1 *; | [X]US4551389 (OHTAKE ETSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * examples 1-3 * * claims 1-6 *; | [Y]JPH07157672 (MATSUMOTO YUSHI SEIYAKU KK) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * claims 1-3 * * paragraphs [0008] - [0013] * * examples 1-4 *; | [A]EP0686079 (GORE & ASS [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH08215522 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 8-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 27 - line 28 * * column 5, line 19 - line 21 * * claim 4 *; | [A]EP0863160 (AMCOL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document * | International search | [X]US4551389 (OHTAKE ETSUO [JP], et al); | [A]JPS6187734 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD); | [A]JPH02255704 (KAO CORP); | [A]JPH05125127 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD); | [X]JPH07216127 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [X]JPH08113654 (SOKEN KAGAKU KK); | [X]JPH08506850 ; | [A]JPH10244152 (AMCOL INTERNATIONAL CORP); | [X]JP2000248005 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [XP]JP2001213727 (MATSUMOTO YUSHI SEIYAKU KK) |