EP1374895 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION OF F(AB) 2 FRAGMENTS OF ANTIBODIES AND METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Instituto Bioclon S.A. de CV. Calzada de Tlalpan No. 4687 Col. Toriello Guerra Delegación Tlalpan 14050 México, D.F. / MX | [2009/45] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Lopez de Silanes, Juan Lucerna No. 7, Col. Juarez Delegacion Cuauhtémoc, Mexico D.F. 06600 / MX | ||
For all designated states Mancilla Nava, Rita Calzada de Tlalpan No. 4687, Colonia Toriello Guerra Delegacion Tlalpan, Mexico, D.F. 14050 / MX | |||
For all designated states Paniagua Solis, Jorge Amores No. 1304, Colonia del Valle Delegacion Benito Juarez, Mexico, D.F. 03100 / MX | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Juan Lopez de Silanes Lucerna No. 7, Col. Juarez Delegacion Cuauthtémoc / MX | 02 /
Rita Mancilla Nava Calzada de Tlalpan No. 4687, Colonia Toriello Guerra Delegacion Tlalpan 14050 / MX | 03 /
Jorge F. Paniagua Solis Amores No. 1304, Colonia del Valle Delegacion Benito Juarez 03100 / MX | [2010/13] |
Former [2009/45] | 01 /
Juan Lopez de Silanes Lucerna No. 7, Col. Juarez Delegacion Cuauthtémoc / MX | ||
02 /
Rita Mancilla Nava Calzada de Tlalpan No. 4687, Colonia Toriello Guerra Delegacion Tlalpan 14050 / MX | |||
03 /
Jorge Paniagua Solis Amores No. 1304, Colonia del Valle Delegacion Benito Juarez 03100 / MX | |||
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02703990.8 | 28.02.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002MX00013 | Priority number, date | US20010798076 | 05.03.2001 Original published format: US 798076 | [2004/41] |
Former [2004/01] | US20010798076 | 28.02.2001 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02068475 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1374895 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1374895 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/18 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
C07K16/065 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP,US);
C07K16/241 (EP,US);
C07K16/249 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG AUS F(AB) 2- FRAGMENTEN VON ANTIKÖRPERN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2004/01] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION OF F(AB) 2 FRAGMENTS OF ANTIBODIES AND METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF | [2004/01] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE DE FRAGMENTS F(AB) 2 D'ANTICORPS ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2003 | Translation filed | 29.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 20.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.04.2009 | 05.03.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.04.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   04.05.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | CH | 28.02.2011 | IE | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | LU | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/08] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
IE | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | FI | 30.06.2010 | |
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 30.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4806346 (HUM WAH-TUNG [US], et al) [Y] 1,5-8,10-13,17,19-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US4849352 (SULLIVAN JOHN B [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US5328834 (NGO THAT T [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]ES2106183T (THERAPEUTIC ANTIBODIES INC) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y]US5733742 (LANDON JOHN [GB]) [Y] 1,5-8,10-13,17,19-26 * column 5, line 46 - line 55; claims 1-9 * | by applicant | US4806346 | US4940670 | US5888511 |