EP1354355 - PLANARIZERS FOR SPIN ETCH PLANARIZATION OF ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Honeywell International, Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKHERJEE, Shyama, Honeywell International Inc. PO Box 2245, 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | 02 /
LEVERT, Joseph, Honeywell International Inc. PO Box 2245, 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | 03 /
DEBEAR, Donald, Honeywell International Inc. PO Box 2245, 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 02704222.5 | 22.01.2002 | [2003/43] | WO2002US01861 | Priority number, date | US20010768439 | 23.01.2001 Original published format: US 768439 | US20010847766 | 01.05.2001 Original published format: US 847766 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02059966 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1354355 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/48 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
H01L21/32115 (EP);
C23F3/06 (EP);
H01L21/32134 (EP);
H01L21/7684 (EP);
H01L23/53233 (EP);
H01L23/53238 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANARISIERER ZUR SCHLEUDER ÄTZPLANARISIERUNG ELEKTRONISCHER BAUELEMENTE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2003/43] | English: | PLANARIZERS FOR SPIN ETCH PLANARIZATION OF ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2003/43] | French: | AGENTS DE PLANARISATION POUR PLANARISATION PAR GRAVURE CENTRIFUGE DE COMPOSANTS ELECTRONIQUES ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 08.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 24.01.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6146991 |