EP1368630 - PIN1 AS MARKER FOR ABNORMAL CELL GROWTH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pintex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 313 Pleasant Street Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2003/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Da, Gong 157 Gerry Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | 02 /
BAO, Lere 145 Day Street Newton, MA 02466 / US | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02704380.1 | 08.02.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002US03658 | Priority number, date | US20010267575P | 09.02.2001 Original published format: US 267575 P | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02065091 | Date: | 22.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1368630 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574 | [2004/24] | CPC: |
G01N33/57434 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
G01N33/5017 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G01N33/57415 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/50] | G01N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIN1 ALS MARKER FÜR ABNORMALES ZELLWACHSTUM | [2003/50] | English: | PIN1 AS MARKER FOR ABNORMAL CELL GROWTH | [2003/50] | French: | PROTEINES OU ACIDES NUCLEIQUES PIN1 UTILISES COMME MARQUEUR DE CROISSANCE CELLULAIRE ANORMALE | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 03.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 24.10.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9717986 (SALK INST FOR BIOLOGICAL STUDI [US]) [X] 1-47 * column 13, line 35 - column 14, line 45; examples 4,9 *; | [LPX]WO0138878 (BETH ISRAEL HOSPITAL [US]) [LPX] 1-47 * example -; claim - *; | [X] - RIPPMANN J F ET AL, "PHOSPHORYLATION-DEPENDENT PROLINE ISOMERIZATION CATALYZED BY PIN1 IS ESSENTIAL FOR TUMOR CELL SURVIVAL AND ENTRY INTO MITOSIS", CELL GROWTH AND DIFFERENTIATION, THE ASSOCIATION, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200007), vol. 11, no. 7, ISSN 1044-9523, pages 409 - 416, XP001009459 [X] 1-47 * abstract * * page 412, column R, paragraph L - page 414, column R, paragraph L * | [X] - LU PEI-JUNG ET AL, "The prolyl isomerase Pin1 restores the function of Alzheimer-associated phosphorylated tau protein", NATURE, MACMILLAN MAGAZINES, US, (19990624), vol. 399, no. 6738, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 784 - 788, XP002148142 [X] 40,41,43 * "Methods"; page 788 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/21650 | [A] - VAARALA M H ET AL, "Differentially expressed genes in two LNCaP prostate cancer cell lines REFLECTING CHANGES DURING PROSTATE CANCER PROGRESSION", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, UNITED STATES AND CANADIAN ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY, BALTIMORE,, US, (200008), vol. 80, no. 8, ISSN 0023-6837, pages 1259 - 1268, XP002225395 [A] 1-47 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/labinvest.3780134 | [A] - HERNANDEZ A ET AL, "ASSESSMENT OF DIFFERENTIAL GENE EXPRESSION PATTERNS IN HUMAN COLON CANCERS", ANNALS OF SURGERY, J. B. LIPPINCOTT COMPANY, PHILADELPHIA, US, (200010), vol. 232, no. 4, ISSN 0003-4932, pages 576 - 585, XP009004872 [A] 1-47 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00000658-200010000-00013 | [A] - CIOCCA D R ET AL, "Molecular markers for predicting response to tamoxifen in breast cancer", ENDOCRINE, MACMILLAN, BASINGSTOKE, GB, (200008), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 1355-008X, pages 1 - 10, XP002964827 [A] 1-47 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/ENDO:13:1:1 | [PX] - WULF GERBURG M ET AL, "Pin1 is overexpressed in breast cancer and cooperates with Ras signaling in increasing the transcriptional activity of c-Jun towards cyclin D1", EMBO (EUROPEAN MOLECULAR BIOLOGY ORGANIZATION) JOURNAL, &, (20010702), vol. 20, no. 13, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 3459 - 3472, XP002276442 [PX] 1-47 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/20.13.3459 | International search | [X]US5972697 (HUNTER TONY [US], et al); | [Y] - HARLOW ET AL., Antibodies, a laboratory manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, (1988), XP002952556 [Y] * pages 319, 321-323 * |