EP1363695 - INGROWTH PREVENTING INDWELLING CATHETER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Watson, David A. 59 Whitewood Road Westwood, MA 02090 / US | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Gerbaulet, Hannes RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Gerbaulet, Hannes, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Richter, Werdermann Gerbaulet & Hofmann Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02704465.0 | 28.02.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002US06361 | Priority number, date | US20010272722P | 01.03.2001 Original published format: US 272722 P | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02070036 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1363695 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1363695 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.03.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M29/00, A61M27/00 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
A61M27/008 (EP,US);
A61M27/006 (EP,US);
A61M2210/0693 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/48] | A61M29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DAS EINWACHSEN VERHINDERNDE VERWEILKATHETERANORDNUNG | [2003/48] | English: | INGROWTH PREVENTING INDWELLING CATHETER ASSEMBLY | [2003/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CATHETER A DEMEURE DE PREVENTION D'UNE INTERPOSITION | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 11.11.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.12.2009 | BE | 23.12.2009 | CY | 23.12.2009 | DK | 23.12.2009 | FI | 23.12.2009 | IT | 23.12.2009 | NL | 23.12.2009 | SE | 23.12.2009 | TR | 23.12.2009 | LU | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | GR | 24.03.2010 | ES | 03.04.2010 | PT | 23.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
LU | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
IT | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
DK | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
CY | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
GR | 24.03.2010 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
BE | 23.12.2009 | ||
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
NL | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
PT | 23.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
ES | 03.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 23.12.2009 | |
FI | 23.12.2009 | ||
SE | 23.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 23.12.2009 | |
SE | 23.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0121215 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,13,15-18,20 * page 9, paragraph 3 *; | [X]JPS61226061 (KURARAY CO) [X] 1 * paragraph [0004]; figure 6 *; | [A]EP0778036 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-40* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US6053900 (BROWN JOE E [US], et al); | [Y]US6093180 (ELSBERRY DENNIS D [US]) |