EP1390529 - METHOD OF ANALYSING DNA METHYLATION USING FLUORESCENCE POLARISATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epigenomics AG Kastanienallee 24 10435 Berlin / DE | [2004/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERLIN, Kurt Marienkäferweg 4 14532 Stahnsdorf / DE | [2004/09] | Representative(s) | Schubert, Klemens Müller & Schubert Patentanwälte Schlüterstrasse 37 10629 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/09] | Schubert, Klemens, Dr. Neue Promenade 5 10178 Berlin-Mitte / DE | Application number, filing date | 02704676.2 | 29.01.2002 | [2004/09] | WO2002EP00922 | Priority number, date | DE2001104937 | 29.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10104937 | [2004/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02061123 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1390529 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1390529 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2004/09] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6858 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6858, C12Q2523/125 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANALYSE DER DNA-METHYLIERUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG VON FLUORESZENZPOLARISATION | [2004/09] | English: | METHOD OF ANALYSING DNA METHYLATION USING FLUORESCENCE POLARISATION | [2004/09] | French: | PROCEDE D'ANALYSE DE LA METHYLATION D'ADN PAR POLARISATION DE FLUORESENCE | [2004/09] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.08.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 08.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2004 | BE | 29.09.2004 | CH | 29.09.2004 | FI | 29.09.2004 | IT | 29.09.2004 | LI | 29.09.2004 | NL | 29.09.2004 | TR | 29.09.2004 | DK | 29.12.2004 | GR | 29.12.2004 | SE | 29.12.2004 | ES | 09.01.2005 | CY | 29.01.2005 | LU | 29.01.2005 | IE | 31.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | PT | 28.02.2005 | [2008/04] |
Former [2007/38] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
IT | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
CY | 29.01.2005 | ||
LU | 29.01.2005 | ||
IE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
CY | 29.01.2005 | ||
LU | 29.01.2005 | ||
IE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
LU | 29.01.2005 | ||
IE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
TR | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
IE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
IE | 31.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
NL | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
DK | 29.12.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
BE | 29.09.2004 | ||
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
ES | 09.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
CH | 29.09.2004 | ||
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
LI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
GR | 29.12.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 29.09.2004 | |
FI | 29.09.2004 | ||
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.09.2004 | |
SE | 29.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 29.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0382433 (ICI PLC [GB]) [AD] 1-15 * page 3, line 22 - page 11, line 44 * * claim 1 *; | [AD]WO9928498 (EPIGENOMICS GMBH [DE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 23, line 1 - page 44, line 9 *; | [AD]WO0011220 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 6, line 12 - page 8, line 18 ** claims 1,5,6 *; | [A]WO0070090 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 17, line 35 - page 18, line 11 * * figure 3 * * claims 7-11 * |