EP1383961 - ASSEMBLY FOR TREATING A WEB OF PAPER OR PAPERBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metso Paper, Inc. Fabianinkatu 9 A 00130 Helsinki / FI | [2004/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISSINEN, Vilho Onkimaantie 195 FIN-04660 Numminen / FI | 02 /
LEIMU, Juha Tiilentekijänkatu 9 C as. 3 FIN-20810 Turku / FI | 03 /
RANTANEN, Rauno Oksalanmäki FIN-40950 Muurame / FI | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | Hovi, Simo Pekka Tapani, et al Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Hovi, Simo, et al Seppo Laine Oy, Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 02704783.6 | 13.03.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002FI00203 | Priority number, date | FI20010000504 | 13.03.2001 Original published format: FI 20010504 | [2004/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072953 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1383961 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1383961 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D21H23/50 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
B05B13/0207 (EP,US);
B05B12/18 (EP,US);
B05B14/30 (EP,US);
B05B15/55 (EP,US);
B05B15/555 (EP,US);
D21H23/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AGGREGAT ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER BAHN AUS PAPIER ODER PAPPE | [2004/05] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR TREATING A WEB OF PAPER OR PAPERBOARD | [2004/05] | French: | ENSEMBLE POUR TRAITER UNE BANDE DE PAPIER OU DE CARTON | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 21.11.2007 | CH | 21.11.2007 | CY | 21.11.2007 | DK | 21.11.2007 | FI | 21.11.2007 | LI | 21.11.2007 | NL | 21.11.2007 | TR | 21.11.2007 | SE | 21.02.2008 | GR | 22.02.2008 | ES | 04.03.2008 | GB | 13.03.2008 | IE | 13.03.2008 | LU | 13.03.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | PT | 21.04.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | BE | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
CY | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
TR | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
GB | 13.03.2008 | ||
IE | 13.03.2008 | ||
LU | 13.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | BE | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
CY | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
GB | 13.03.2008 | ||
IE | 13.03.2008 | ||
LU | 13.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | BE | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
CY | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
GB | 13.03.2008 | ||
IE | 13.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | BE | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
GB | 13.03.2008 | ||
IE | 13.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | BE | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
GR | 22.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IE | 13.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | BE | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
IE | 13.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | BE | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | BE | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
PT | 21.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | BE | 21.11.2007 | |
CH | 21.11.2007 | ||
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 21.11.2007 | |
DK | 21.11.2007 | ||
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CH | 21.11.2007 | |
FI | 21.11.2007 | ||
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 21.11.2007 | |
LI | 21.11.2007 | ||
NL | 21.11.2007 | ||
SE | 21.02.2008 | ||
ES | 04.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4944960 (SUNDHOLM PATRICK J [FI], et al); | [X]WO9212803 (WEYERHAEUSER CO [US]); | [A]EP0690171 (VALMET PAPER MACHINERY INC [FI]); | [A]WO9915731 (VALMET CORP [FI], et al) |