EP1368545 - Fire rated glass flooring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/50] | FIRE RATED GLASS FLOORING | ||
[2009/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ely Holdings Limited 103A High Street Lees Oldham OL4 4LY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Ely Holdings Limited 103A High Street Lees Oldham OL4 4LY / GB | ||
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Roger Wilde Limited Chareau House, 1 Miles Street Oldham OL1 3NY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAE, Michael, Scott 2 Butchers Hill, Ickleton, Saffron Walden Cambridge CB10 1SR / GB | [2010/18] |
Former [2004/15] | 01 /
RAE, Michael, Scott 2 Butchers Hill Ickleton Saffron Walden Cambridge CB10 1SR / GB | ||
Former [2003/50] | 01 /
RAE, Michael, Scott 88 Norwich Street Cambridge CB2 1NE / GB | Representative(s) | Trueman, Lucy Petra Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Trueman, Lucy Petra Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02704958.4 | 11.03.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002GB01113 | Priority number, date | GB20010005991 | 10.03.2001 Original published format: GB 0105991 | GB20010010820 | 03.05.2001 Original published format: GB 0110820 | GB20010029904 | 14.12.2001 Original published format: GB 0129904 | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072970 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1368545 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1368545 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04B5/46 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
E06B3/6617 (EP,US);
E04B5/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Feurhemmende Glasdecke | [2009/47] | English: | Fire rated glass flooring | [2009/47] | French: | Plancher en verre résistant au feu | [2009/47] |
Former [2003/50] | FEUERGESCHÜTZTE GLASDECKE | ||
Former [2003/50] | FIRE RATED GLASS FLOORING | ||
Former [2003/50] | PLANCHER EN VERRE COTE POUR SA RESISTANCE AU FEU | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CY | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | IT | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/14] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
CY | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | NL | 05.05.2010 | |
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0319695 (KOLLER METALLBAU AG [CH]) [A] 13-15,18,23-26 * figures 1-4,7,10; claim 1 *; | [Y]GB2289076 (MANN MCGOWAN FABRICATIONS LIMI [GB]) [Y] 5 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 1 *; | [XAY]FR2723123 (STEFANOVIC BRANISLAV [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,6-10 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 22 * * page 6, line 6 - page 6, line 29 * * page 10, line 5 - page 11, line 10 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 2,11,12 [Y] 5,14,15,18; | [A]US5715636 (TAYLOR JOHN R [US]) [A] 13,16,17* figures 2-8 *; | [YA]DE29911069U (KRAESS WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [Y] 14,15,18 * page 19, paragraph 4 - page 20, paragraph 1 * * page 22, paragraph 1 - page 22, paragraph 4 * * figures 1,5,6,9-11 * [A] 13 |