EP1355144 - SOLUTION AGITATING METHOD AND SAMPLE CELL USING FOR THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Tatsurou 16-20, Osumigaoka 3-chome Kyotanabe-shi, Kyoto 610-0351 / JP | 02 /
KAMEI, Akihito 24-5, Kinmeidaichuo Yawata-shi, Kyoto 614-8295 / JP | [2003/43] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/43] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02705213.3 | 14.03.2002 | [2003/43] | WO2002JP02450 | Priority number, date | JP20010083410 | 22.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001083410 | [2003/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02077611 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1355144 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/38, G01N21/59 | [2003/43] | CPC: |
G01N1/38 (EP,US);
G01N15/075 (EP,US);
G01N2001/387 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/43] | Title | German: | LÖSUNGSSCHÜTTELVERFAHREN UND PROBENZELLE FÜR DAS VERFAHREN | [2003/43] | English: | SOLUTION AGITATING METHOD AND SAMPLE CELL USING FOR THE METHOD | [2003/43] | French: | PROCEDE D'AGITATION D'UNE SOLUTION ET CELLULE ECHANTILLON UTILISEE DANS CE PROCEDE | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2002 | Translation filed | 02.12.2002 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2002 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 09.10.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4397684 (GROSJEAN JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]); | [X]JPH10221229 (NIKKISO CO LTD); | [X]JPH11190696 (DENKI KAGAKU KEIKI KK); | [A]JP3058876B |