EP1486449 - ELEVATOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Toshiaki, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
TAKIGAWA, Yukihiro, c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02705265.3 | 15.03.2002 | [2004/51] | WO2002JP02508 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03078289 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1486449 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1486449 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B66B7/00, B66B5/00, B66B11/00 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
B66B11/0045 (EP);
B66B5/00 (KR);
B66B19/00 (EP);
B66B5/0087 (EP);
B66B7/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/51] | B66B7/00, B66B5/00 | Designated contracting states | DE [2010/50] |
Former [2004/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | AUFZUGSVORRICHTUNG | [2004/51] | English: | ELEVATOR DEVICE | [2004/51] | French: | ENSEMBLE ASCENSEUR | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2003 | Translation filed | 15.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 21.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0922663 (THYSSEN AUFZUEGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0030] - [0038] *; | [A]WO0044664 (KONE CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-8* abstract * | International search | [A]JP2001253658 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2002046951 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2001139249 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2001220077 (MITSUBISHI ELEC BUILDING TECHN); | [A]JP2001048437 (HITACHI BUILDING SYS CO LTD) |