EP1370948 - Shared memory access control system and method for computer architecture for broadband networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/51] | MEMORY PROTECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE FOR BROADBAND NETWORKS | ||
[2009/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | [2010/20] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Sony Computer Entertainment Inc. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUOKI, Masakazu c/o SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | 02 /
YAMAZAKI, Takeshi c/o Sony Computer Entertainment America, Inc. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Floor Foster City, CA 94404-2175 / US | [2009/34] |
Former [2003/51] | 01 /
SUZUOKI, Masakazu, SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINM. INC. 2-6-21, Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-0062 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAZAKI, Takeshi, Sony Comp. Ent. America Inc. 919 East Hillsdale Blvd., 2nd Floor Foster City, CA 94404-2175 / US | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02705345.3 | 19.03.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002JP02606 | Priority number, date | US20010816020 | 22.03.2001 Original published format: US 816020 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02077826 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1370948 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1370948 | Date: | 19.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/14 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
G06F12/1466 (EP,US);
G06F12/14 (KR);
H04L69/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/51] | G06F12/14, G06F15/16, G06F15/163, G06F15/167, G06F15/17, G06F15/173, G06F15/177 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2003/51] | Title | German: | Speicherzugangskontrollsystem und -verfahren für eine Rechnerarchitektur für Breitbandnetzwerke | [2009/25] | English: | Shared memory access control system and method for computer architecture for broadband networks | [2009/25] | French: | Système et procédé de contrôle d'accès à mémoire partagée dans une architecture informatique pour réseaux à large bande | [2009/34] |
Former [2003/51] | SPEICHERSCHUTZSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR COMPUTERARCHITEKTUR FÜR BREITBANDNETZE | ||
Former [2003/51] | MEMORY PROTECTION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMPUTER ARCHITECTURE FOR BROADBAND NETWORKS | ||
Former [2003/51] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE PROTECTION DE MEMOIRE POUR ARCHITECTURE D'ORDINATEUR SUR RESEAUX A LARGE BANDE | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 08.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.07.2009 | 22.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.05.2010 | DK | 19.05.2010 | FI | 19.05.2010 | SE | 19.05.2010 | [2011/14] |
Former [2011/07] | DK | 19.05.2010 | |
FI | 19.05.2010 | ||
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | FI | 19.05.2010 | |
SE | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | SE | 19.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4622631 (FRANK STEVEN J [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * figures 1,2,5A-10 * * column 8, line 27 - column 9, line 35 * * column 16, lines 6-22 * * column 17, lines 8-24 *; | [A]US5978839 (OKUHARA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-40 * column A ** column 2, line 39 - column 10, line 46 * | International search | [Y]JPS5412643 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPS56123051 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]EP0077404 (FANUC LTD [JP]); | [Y]JPS6412364 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JPH01217689 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JPH04288643 (NEC CORP); | [Y]JPH05242057 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JPH0612333 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [Y]JPH09311839 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y] - MAMORU MAEKAWA, Bunsan operating system (distributed operating system), TOKYO, KYORITSU SHUPPAN CO., LTD., (19911225), XP002952448 [Y] * ISBN 4-320-02570-9; page 175 - page 182 * | [Y] - IBM system/370 kakucho architecture (SA22-7085-0 IBM system/370 extended architecture principles of operation), IBM JAPAN, (198404), XP002952449 [Y] * pages 3-8 - pages 3-10 * | by applicant | US5978839 |