EP1395944 - FINGERPRINT RECOGNITION APPARATUS WITH AUTOMATIC FINGER CONTACT SENSING FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keico Hightech Inc. 197-17, Kuro-3dong, Kuro-gu Seoul 152-053 / KR | [2004/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HWANG, Moon-sung 367 chulsan-dong Kwang Myung City 423-033 Kyunggi-do / KR | [2004/11] | Representative(s) | Musker, David Charles, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/50] | Musker, David Charles, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2005/43] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/11] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02705569.8 | 13.03.2002 | [2004/11] | WO2002KR00433 | Priority number, date | KR20010014707U | 19.05.2001 Original published format: KR 2001014707 U | [2004/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02095666 | Date: | 28.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1395944 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/20, G06K9/00, G07C9/00 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
G06V40/13 (EP,US);
G07C9/00563 (EP,US);
G07C9/37 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/11] | G06K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/11] | Title | German: | FINGERABDRUCKERKENNUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT AUTOMATISCHER FINGERKONTAKTERFASSUNGSFUNKTION | [2004/11] | English: | FINGERPRINT RECOGNITION APPARATUS WITH AUTOMATIC FINGER CONTACT SENSING FUNCTION | [2004/11] | French: | APPAREIL DE RECONNAISSANCE D'EMPREINTES DOTE D'UNE FONCTION AUTOMATIQUE DE DETECTION DU CONTACT D'UN DOIGT | [2004/11] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2003 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 15.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 22.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/01] | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0379333 (GRAVES MARCEL ALBERT [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0805247 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 33 - column 7, line 5 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO9810372 (ARETE ASSOCIATES [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * page 1, line 15 - line 30 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 40 * * page 13, line 5 - page 15, line 40 * * page 25, line 10 - page 30, line 21 * * figures 1-34 *; | [X]EP0976897 (ENIX CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0219] * * figures 1-46 *; | [A]KR20010002598 (MIRAE CORP [KR]) [A] 1,2* abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0488586 (SHARP KK); | [A]KR930000949B (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR200196620Y (SAMJIN COMP SERVICE CO LTD [KR]) |