EP1441810 - APPARATUS FOR PROGRAMMING AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/32] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROGRAMMING AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE | ||
[2010/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [2011/24] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2004/32] | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Northeast Minneapolis, MN 55432 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, David, W. 4950 138th Circle Apple Valley, MN 55124 / US | 02 /
MALEK, Shahram 18836 68th Avenue North Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | 03 /
GOETZ, Steven, M. 4650 58th Place North Brooklyn Center, MN 55429 / US | 04 /
GREVIOUS, John, J. 2239 Wilson Street Northeast Minneapolis, MN 55418 / US | 05 /
CHRISTOPHERSON, Mark, A. 4100 Reiland Lane Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/32] | 01 /
LEE, David, W. 4950 138th Circle Apple Valley, MN 55124 / US | ||
02 /
MALEK, Shahram 5400 Ximines Lane Plymouth, MN 55442 / US | |||
03 /
GOETZ, Steven, M. 4650 58th Place North Brooklyn Center, MN 55429 / US | |||
04 /
GREVIOUS, John, J. 2239 Wilson Street Northeast Minneapolis, MN 55418 / US | |||
05 /
CHRISTOPHERSON, Mark, A. 4100 Reiland Lane Shoreview, MN 55126 / US | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/32] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 02705857.7 | 16.01.2002 | [2004/32] | WO2002US01540 | Priority number, date | US20010002328 | 01.11.2001 Original published format: US 2328 | [2004/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03037430 | Date: | 08.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1441810 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1441810 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/372 | [2004/32] | CPC: |
A61N1/37252 (EP,US);
A61N1/37235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM PROGRAMMIEREN EINER IMPLANTIERBAREN MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2010/12] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PROGRAMMING AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE | [2010/12] | French: | APPAREIL POUR PROGRAMMER UN DISPOSITIF MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE | [2010/12] |
Former [2004/32] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PROGRAMMIEREN EINER IMPLANTIERBAREN MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2004/32] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROGRAMMING AN IMPLANTABLE MEDICAL DEVICE | ||
Former [2004/32] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR PROGRAMMER UN DISPOSITIF MEDICAL IMPLANTABLE | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2011 | BE | 15.06.2011 | CY | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | IT | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | ES | 26.09.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | GB | 16.01.2012 | IE | 16.01.2012 | LU | 16.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
GB | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
GB | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
GB | 16.01.2012 | ||
IE | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
GB | 16.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
GB | 16.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5438990 (WAHLSTRAND JOHN D [US], et al) [Y] 22 * figure 2 * * column 5, line 34 - line 42 * * column 11, line 65 - column 12, line 14 *[A] 1-16; | [YA]US5683432 (GOEDEKE STEVEN D [US], et al) [Y] 16,22 * abstract * * column 1, line 13 - line 25 * * column 2, line 57 - line 60 * [A] 1-15; | [YA]US2001003799 (BOVEJA BIRINDER BOB [US]) [Y] 16,22 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0223] * [A] 1-15 | by applicant | US4692147 | US5752977 |