Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005060705 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2006 | A3 | WO2005060705 | 07.07.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58330904 | 25.06.2004 | US74180103 | 18.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6817806 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US27212801 | 28.02.2001 | US8677202 | 28.02.2002 | US63329703 | 31.07.2003 | US27473801 | 09.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7591611 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2009 | B2 | US2008038064 | 14.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18734205 | 21.07.2005 | US71743307 | 12.03.2007 | US27212801 | 28.02.2001 | US98426604 | 08.11.2004 | US8677202 | 28.02.2002 | US63329703 | 31.07.2003 | US27473801 | 09.03.2001 | WO2004US43046 | 20.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005069387 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27212801 | 28.02.2001 | US98426604 | 08.11.2004 | US8677202 | 28.02.2002 | US63329703 | 31.07.2003 | US27473801 | 09.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004129339 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27212801 | 28.02.2001 | US8677202 | 28.02.2002 | US74180103 | 18.12.2003 | US63329703 | 31.07.2003 | US27473801 | 09.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002240570B | Global Dossier | 31.07.2008 | B2 | Priority number | Date | US27212801 | 28.02.2001 | US27473801 | 09.03.2001 | US0206344 | 28.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1383971 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2008 | B1 | EP1383971 | 15.12.2004 | A4 | EP1383971 | 28.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27212801 | 28.02.2001 | US27473801 | 09.03.2001 | US0206344 | 28.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60230401D1 | 29.01.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US27212801 | 28.02.2001 | US27473801 | 09.03.2001 | US0206344 | 28.02.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2002119011 | 29.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27212801 | 28.02.2001 | US8677202 | 28.02.2002 | US27473801 | 09.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02068770 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2004 | A8 | WO02068770 | 06.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US27212801 | 28.02.2001 | US27473801 | 09.03.2001 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE417965T | 15.01.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US27212801 | 28.02.2001 | US27473801 | 09.03.2001 |