EP1383971 - FLUENT MATERIAL CONFINEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arellanes, Al M. Pier 54, Terry Francois Boulevard, Suite 202 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2008/51] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Arellanes, Al M. Pier 54, Terry Francois Boulevard, Suite 202 San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/05] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02706486.4 | 28.02.2002 | [2004/05] | WO2002US06344 | Priority number, date | US20010272128P | 28.02.2001 Original published format: US 272128 P | US20010274738P | 09.03.2001 Original published format: US 274738 P | [2004/21] |
Former [2004/05] | US20010274738P | 28.02.2001 | |
US20010272128P | 09.03.2001 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02068770 | Date: | 06.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1383971 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1383971 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.09.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E02B3/10 | [2004/36] | CPC: |
E02B3/108 (EP,US);
E02B3/127 (EP,US);
E02D29/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/05] | E04C2/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFFANGSYSTEM FÜR FLIESSFÄHIGE MATERIALIEN | [2004/05] | English: | FLUENT MATERIAL CONFINEMENT SYSTEM | [2004/05] | French: | SYSTEME DE CONFINEMENT DE MATIERE FLUIDE | [2004/05] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/05] | 06.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 01.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Request for further processing for: | 01.08.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2007 | Decision despatched | 14.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 14.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.07.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.2006 | 28.02.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2007 | 29.02.2008 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   29.08.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.2008 | BE | 17.12.2008 | CY | 17.12.2008 | DK | 17.12.2008 | FI | 17.12.2008 | IT | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | TR | 17.12.2008 | CH | 28.02.2009 | IE | 28.02.2009 | LI | 28.02.2009 | LU | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | FR | 02.03.2009 | GB | 17.03.2009 | SE | 17.03.2009 | GR | 18.03.2009 | ES | 28.03.2009 | PT | 18.05.2009 | DE | 01.09.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IT | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
LU | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IT | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
GB | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
FR | 02.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
DE | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
IE | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
CH | 28.02.2009 | ||
LI | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/38] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
NL | 17.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8015458U (VIGNON, J-F) [A] 1* page 3; figure 1 *; | [A]US4945689 (JOHNSON JR ROBERT H [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1,3,4 * | International search | [Y]US2121173 (MATHEW MACPHERSON WILLIAM); | [Y]US3123207 ; | [Y]US4405045 (VILLA-REAL ANTONY-EUCLID C [US]); | [X]US4785604 (JOHNSON JR ROBERT H [US]); | [Y]US5147150 (BERKHOUT HENDRIK C [NL], et al); | [Y]US5237601 (BOUTET JOHN C [US], et al) |