EP1358267 - ENVIRONMENTALLY FRIENDLY COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Walcher, Ulrich Weststrasse 13 89281 Altenstadt / DE | For all designated states Dinkelaker, Albrecht Blumenweg 2 79669 Zell im Wiesental / DE | [2005/49] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Walcher, Ulrich Weststrasse 13 89281 Altenstadt / DE | ||
For all designated states Dinkelaker, Albrecht Seegasse 17 64546 Mörfelden-Walldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Lasch, Hartmut LICHTI - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Lasch, Hartmut Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys.Dr. rer. nat Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 02706651.3 | 30.01.2002 | [2003/45] | WO2002DE00320 | Priority number, date | DE2001104004 | 31.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10104004 | [2003/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02060990 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1358267 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1358267 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/04 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08L91/06 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/04, C08L91/06 (EP,US);
C08L91/06, C08L67/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMWELTFREUNDLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2003/45] | English: | ENVIRONMENTALLY FRIENDLY COMPOSITION | [2003/45] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPATIBLE POUR L'ENVIRONNEMENT | [2003/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 21.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.05.2006 | FI | 24.05.2006 | IE | 24.05.2006 | IT | 24.05.2006 | TR | 24.05.2006 | DK | 24.08.2006 | SE | 24.08.2006 | GR | 25.08.2006 | ES | 04.09.2006 | PT | 24.10.2006 | AT | 30.01.2007 | LU | 30.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 24.05.2006 | |
FI | 24.05.2006 | ||
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
AT | 30.01.2007 | ||
LU | 30.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
AT | 30.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
GR | 25.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
IT | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
IE | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
PT | 24.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 24.05.2006 | |
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 24.08.2006 | |
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 24.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08188706 ; | [X]DE3220324 (DAICEL CHEM [JP]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * claims 1,2,6 * * pages 3-4, lines 35-35 *; | [X]WO9428061 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-10 * claim 2 * * page 5, lines 7-10 * * page 8, lines 3,4,8,18 * * page 22, line 26 * * page 10, lines 7-12,22-26 * * example 1 *; | [X]EP0708148 (INVENTA AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * claim 1 * * page 3, lines 43,44,52 * * page 4, lines 1-15 * * page 4, lines 21-23 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961129), vol. 1996, no. 11, & JP08188706 A 19960723 (GUNZE LTD) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * |