EP1361923 - METHOD FOR SULPHURIZING HYDROTREATING CATALYSTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2007/40] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Arkema France 4-8, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states ARKEMA 4-8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Atofina 4/8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRUN, Claude Clos Saint Pierre F-64320 Idron / FR | 02 /
FREMY, Georges Chemin du Coulomme F-64390 Sauveterre de Bearn / FR | [2003/47] | Representative(s) | Treuil, Claude, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Treuil, Claude, et al ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/46] | Treuil, Claude, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense / FR | ||
Former [2005/13] | Treuil, Claude ARKEMA Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02706852.7 | 13.02.2002 | [2003/47] | WO2002FR00548 | Priority number, date | FR20010002410 | 22.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0102410 | [2003/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02066161 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361923 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/20, C10G45/08 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
B01J37/20 (EP,KR,US);
B01J23/882 (EP,US);
B01J27/0515 (EP,US);
C10G45/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SCHWEFELUNG VON HYDROBEHANDLUNGSKATALYSATOREN | [2003/47] | English: | METHOD FOR SULPHURIZING HYDROTREATING CATALYSTS | [2003/47] | French: | PROCEDE DE SULFURATION DES CATALYSEURS D'HYDROTRAITEMENT | [2003/47] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/47] | 16.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/31] | 26.05.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/31] | Appeal following examination | 28.01.2005 | Appeal received No. T0574/05 | 22.04.2005 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.04.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 15.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.04.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 15.07.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.08.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]FR2758478 (ELF AQUITAINE [FR]) [DX] 1-10 * page 6, column 20 - page 7, column 2 * * page 11 - page 18; claims 1-16 * |