EP1364147 - FLEXIBLE DUCT WITH SHRINKAGE-PROOF FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technip France ZAC Danton, 6-8, allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Technip France ZAC Danton, 6-8, allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESPINASSE, Philippe, François 35, rue Pigeon F-76420 Bihorel / FR | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Bertrand, Didier, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Bertrand, Didier, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot 38 Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/48] | Bertrand, Didier, et al Cabinet FEDIT-LORIOT 38, Avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02706871.7 | 18.02.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002FR00613 | Priority number, date | FR20010002403 | 22.02.2001 Original published format: FR 0102403 | [2003/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02066878 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364147 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1364147 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16L11/08 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
F16L11/083 (EP,US);
F16L11/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DK, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2003/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIEGSAME LEITUNG MIT EINER DAS " SICH-SENKEN" DER DICHTUNGSSCHICHT VERHINDERDEN ZWISCHENSCHICHT | [2003/48] | English: | FLEXIBLE DUCT WITH SHRINKAGE-PROOF FILM | [2003/48] | French: | CONDUITE FLEXIBLE A FILM ANTI-RETASSURE | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 19.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4706713 (SADAMITSU KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - line 67 *; | [XA]US4867205 (BOURNAZEL CLAUDE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 17 - line 33 * [A] 3-9; | [A]FR2784445 (COFLEXIP [FR]) [A] 1 * abstract ** page 6, line 20 - line 34 * | by applicant | EP0166385 | FR2732441 | EP0749546 | FR2752904 | FR2779797 |