EP1372939 - SEALING APPARATUS FOR FORMING SOFT ARTICLE HAVING SEALED PORTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/01] | SEALING APPARATUS AND MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF SOFT ARTICLE HAVING SEALED PORTION | ||
[2010/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2004/24] | For all designated states Uni-Charm Corporation 182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime-ken / JP | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states UNI-CHARM CORPORATION 182, Shimobun Kinsei-cho Kawanoe-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NINOMIYA, A.; c/o Technical Center of Uni-Charm Co 1531-7, Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, H.; c/o Technical Center of Uni-Charm Co. 1531-7, Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 03 /
SHINOHARA, J.; c/o Tech. Center of Uni-Charm Co. 1531-7, Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 04 /
YAMAMOTO, H.; c/o Tech. Center of Uni-Charm Co. 1531-7, Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore LLP European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 02707119.0 | 20.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002JP02691 | Priority number, date | JP20010091925 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001091925 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02078935 | Date: | 10.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1372939 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1372939 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.10.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/08, B65B51/14, B65B51/22 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
B29C65/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/15739 (EP,US);
B29C65/087 (EP,US);
B29C65/7885 (EP,US);
B29C65/7894 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/21 (EP,US);
B29C66/232 (EP,US);
B29C66/346 (EP,US);
B29C66/431 (EP,US);
B29C66/72343 (EP,US);
B29C66/7294 (EP,US);
B29C66/73115 (EP,US);
B29C66/73182 (EP,US);
B29C66/73187 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/81427 (EP,US);
B29C66/8145 (EP,US);
B29C66/81455 (EP,US);
B29C66/81465 (EP,US);
B29C66/81469 (EP,US);
B29C66/81611 (EP,US);
B29C66/8163 (EP,US);
B29C66/8221 (EP,US);
B29C66/82263 (EP,US);
B29C66/82421 (EP,US);
B29C66/8324 (EP);
B29C66/83511 (EP,US);
B29C66/83517 (EP,US);
B29C66/872 (EP,US);
B29C66/9221 (EP,US);
B29C66/92451 (EP,US);
B29C66/93431 (EP,US);
B29C66/93451 (EP,US);
B29C2793/009 (EP,US);
B29C66/433 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [2010/41] |
Former [2004/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG WEICHER ARTIKEL MITABGEDICHTETEN BEREICHEN | [2010/11] | English: | SEALING APPARATUS FOR FORMING SOFT ARTICLE HAVING SEALED PORTION | [2010/11] | French: | APPAREIL D'ETANCHEITE POUR LA FABRICATION D'ARTICLE MOUS COMPORTANT UNE PARTIE TANCHE | [2010/20] |
Former [2004/01] | ABDICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG WEICHER ARTIKEL MIT ABGEDICHTETEM TEIL | ||
Former [2004/01] | SEALING APPARATUS AND MANUFACTURING PROCESS OF SOFT ARTICLE HAVING SEALED PORTION | ||
Former [2004/01] | APPAREIL D' TANCH IT ET PROC D DE FABRICATION D'ARTICLES MOUS COMPORTANT UNE PARTIE TANCHE | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 15.09.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09158775.8 / EP2080608 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3431380 (SUTLIFF ROBERT C, et al) [X] 1-9 * figures 1,2 * [Y] 10; | [XY]US4614078 (KAWABE SEIKICHI [JP]) [X] 1-9 [Y] 10; | [A]US4758293 (SAMIDA JEFFREY J [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]JPH0627529 (CANON KK) [Y] 10 * abstract *; | [A]WO9623645 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US4614078 (KAWABE SEIKICHI [JP]); | [X]JPH0526005Y ; | [X]JPH0627529Y ; | [Y]WO9623645 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]); | [A]US4758293 (SAMIDA JEFFREY J [US]) |