EP1353822 - HAY BALE STACKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morris Industries Ltd. 2131 Airport Drive Saskatoon, SK S7L 7E1 / CA | [2007/01] |
Former [2003/43] | For all designated states Siebenga, Charles 6970 Stagecoach Trail Road Manhattan, MT 59741 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siebenga, Charles 1700 Amsterdam Road Belgrade, MT 59714 / US | [2014/07] |
Former [2007/01] | 01 /
Siebenga, Charles 1700 Amsterdam Road Belgrade, Montana 59714 / US | ||
Former [2003/43] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/27] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/43] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02707411.1 | 04.01.2002 | [2003/43] | WO2002US00384 | Priority number, date | US20010260126P | 05.01.2001 Original published format: US 260126 P | US20020040589 | 04.01.2002 Original published format: US 40589 | [2003/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02052920 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1353822 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1353822 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.06.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/50, A01D87/12, A01D90/08 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
A01D90/08 (EP,US);
A01D85/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/43] | B60P1/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | HEUBALLENSTAPELVORRICHTUNG | [2003/43] | English: | HAY BALE STACKER | [2003/43] | French: | EMPILEUSE DE BALLES DE FOIN | [2003/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 16.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2092089 (MAITRE ETS) [Y] 13,14,19,20 * page 3, line 109 - line 127 * * page 1, line 4 - line 11; figure - *; | [XAY]US4431357 (BUTLER L DENNIS [US]) [X] 1,6,9-12 * column 3, line 59 - column 7, line 23; figures 1,2 * [A] 15 [Y] 13,14,20; | [Y]US4844675 (STROSSER RICHARD P [US], et al) [Y] 13,14,19,20* column 2, line 54 - column 11, line 4; figure - *; | [XY]US4971504 (KLOMPIEN KENNETH [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9,12,15-17 * column 3, line 41 - column 6, line 56; figure - * [Y] 10,11,13,18,19; | [XAY]US5507612 (SIEBENGA CHARLES [US]) [X] 1,6,7,9,12 * column 4, line 29 - column 10, line 45; figure - * [A] 15 [Y] 10,11,13; | [YA]US5607274 (COOK IVAN J [US]) [Y] 10,11,18 * column 4, line 7 - column 8, line 18; figure - * [A] 1,2,8; | [YA]US6079926 (COX JAMES Y [US], et al) [Y] 13 * column 2, line 50 - column 5, line 19; figure - * [A] 1,2,15 | International search | [X]US4431357 (BUTLER L DENNIS [US]); | [X]US5507612 (SIEBENGA CHARLES [US]); | [X]US5607274 (COOK IVAN J [US]); | [X]US6079926 (COX JAMES Y [US], et al); | [XP]US6220811 (BERNECKER MICHAEL J [US]); | [XP]US6328520 (MACLAY THOMAS B [US]) | Examination | US5690461 | by applicant | US6171047 | US6220811 | GB2092089 |