EP1358665 - MOUNTING LUGS PROVIDING REDUCED MICROPHONIC INTERACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing S.A. 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWANK, Harry, Robert 1401 Winchester Drive Lancaster, PA 17601 / US | 02 /
ANDREVSKI, Zygmunt, Marian 151 Snowden Lane Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/45] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte THOMSON multimedia, 46 quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 02707482.2 | 16.01.2002 | [2003/45] | WO2002US01054 | Priority number, date | US20010772402 | 30.01.2001 Original published format: US 772402 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02061796 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358665 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/87 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
H01J29/87 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONTAGEAUFHÄNGUNG MIT VERMINDERTER MICROPHONISHER INTERAKTION | [2003/45] | English: | MOUNTING LUGS PROVIDING REDUCED MICROPHONIC INTERACTION | [2003/45] | French: | PATTES DE FIXATION FOURNISSANT UNE INTERACTION MICROPHONIQUE REDUITE | [2003/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/29] | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH05182602 ; | [X]JPH11146303 ; | [A]US4506188 (PUHAK PETER G [US]) [A] 1,2* column 1, line 20 - line 30 *; | [A]EP0421537 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 27 - line 30 *; | [A]US5053880 (SWANK HARRY R [US]) [A] 1,2 * figure - *; | [X]US5270826 (FOWLER JONATHAN B [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931028), vol. 017, no. 593, Database accession no. (E - 1454), & JP05182602 A 19930723 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3,8 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11146303 A 19990528 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |