EP1370326 - Defibrillator with detection of cardipulmonary resuscitation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/51] | INTERACTIVE METHOD OF PERFORMING CARDIPULMONARY RESUSCITATION WITH MINIMAL DELAY TO DEFIBRILLATION SHOCKS | ||
[2010/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2011/23] |
Former [2003/51] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNYDER, David 352 Wallace Way NE, 15 Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | 02 /
MORGAN, Carlton 4143 Palomino Drive NE Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | [2003/51] | Representative(s) | Wolfs, Marc Johannes Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/51] | Wolfs, Marc Johannes Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 02707883.1 | 25.02.2002 | [2003/51] | WO2002US05663 | Priority number, date | US20010804398 | 13.03.2001 Original published format: US 804398 | [2003/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02072197 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1370326 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1370326 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.11.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/39 | [2003/51] | CPC: |
A61N1/39044 (EP,US);
A61N1/3987 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/51] | Title | German: | Defibrillator mit detektion kardiopulmonarer wiederbelebung | [2010/51] | English: | Defibrillator with detection of cardipulmonary resuscitation | [2010/51] | French: | Défibrillateur avec détection de réanimation cardio-respiratoire | [2010/51] |
Former [2003/51] | INTERAKTIVES VERFAHREN ZUR KARDIOPULMONAREN WIEDERBELEBUNG MIT MINIMALER VERZÖGERUNG ZU DEN DEFIBRILLATIONSSCHOCKS | ||
Former [2003/51] | INTERACTIVE METHOD OF PERFORMING CARDIPULMONARY RESUSCITATION WITH MINIMAL DELAY TO DEFIBRILLATION SHOCKS | ||
Former [2003/51] | PROCEDE INTERACTIF DE REANIMATION CARDIO-RESPIRATOIRE PERMETTANT UN INTERVALLE MINIMAL PAR RAPPORT AUX CHOCS DE DEFIBRILLATION | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2003 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/51] | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2010 | 26.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 21.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2011 | BE | 08.06.2011 | CY | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | IT | 08.06.2011 | NL | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | ES | 19.09.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | IE | 25.02.2012 | LU | 25.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 25.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
IE | 25.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
IT | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
NL | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6021349 (ARAND PATRICIA A [US], et al) [X] 17-19,21-24,29-33* column 4, line 33 - column 7, line 45 *; | [X]WO0030712 (MEDTRONIC PHYSIO CONTROL MANUF [US]) [X] 17-33 * the whole document * | International search | [YP]US6334070 (NOVA RICHARD C [US], et al) | Examination | WO9839061 | EP1079310 | by applicant | WO9427674 | US5607454 | US6021349 | WO0030712 | EP1079310 |