EP1374615 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR MOBILE USERS USING ADAPTIVE ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The DIRECTV Group, Inc. 2230 E. Imperial Highway El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | [2012/09] |
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Hughes Electronics Corporation 200 N. Sepulveda Boulevard El Segundo, California 90245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Donald, C., D. 2350 Moberly Court Thousand Oaks, CA 91360 / US | 02 /
LIM, Wah, L. 30 Canyon Fairway Drive Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Ming, U. 28815 Indian Valley Road Rancho Palos Verdes, CA 90275 / US | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Asquith, Julian Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Duhme, Torsten, et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02709007.5 | 11.01.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002US00842 | Priority number, date | US20010262701P | 19.01.2001 Original published format: US 262701 P | US20010262717P | 19.01.2001 Original published format: US 262717 P | US20010266684P | 05.02.2001 Original published format: US 266684 P | US20010858387 | 15.05.2001 Original published format: US 858387 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02058186 | Date: | 25.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1374615 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/36, H01Q1/24, H01Q3/26, H04Q7/30 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H04W84/042 (US);
H01Q25/00 (EP,US);
H01Q3/2605 (EP,US);
H04B7/0408 (EP,US);
H04W16/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM FÜR MOBILE BENUTZER UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER ADAPTIVE ANTENNE | [2004/01] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR MOBILE USERS USING ADAPTIVE ANTENNA | [2004/01] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION POUR UTILISATEURS MOBILES UTILISANT UNE ANTENNE ADAPTATIVE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 20.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.12.2004 | Request for further processing for: | 06.07.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 06.07.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0860952 (HUGHES ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]JPH11261474 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-4,7-10; | [X]US6016421 (WEISS ANTHONY J [IL], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 9 *; | [X]EP1026778 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 4, line 13 - column 8, line 23 *; | [PX]US2001004604 (TOSHIMITSU KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [PX] 1-3* page 4, column L, line 9 - page 8, column R, line 55 *; | [PX]US6308085 (SHOKI HIROKI [JP]) [PX] 1-4,7-10 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 15 * * column 3, line 63 - column 6, line 61 * |