EP1363625 - COMBINATIONS OF DRUGS (E.G., A BENZIMIDAZOLE AND PENTAMIDINE) FOR THE TREATMENT OF NEOPLASTIC DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Change - classification | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | 23.09.2011 | Change - classification | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CombinatoRx, Incorporated 650 Albany Street Boston, MA 02118 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Combinatorx, Incorporated 650 Albany Street Boston, MA 02118 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORISY, Alexis 31 Revere Street, Apartment 2 Boston, MA 02114 / US | 02 /
KEITH, Curtis 42 Rutland Square, Apartment 2 Boston, MA 02118 / US | 03 /
FOLEY, Michael, A. 93 Wolcott Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | 04 /
STOCKWELL, Brent, R. 59 West Cedar Street, Apartment 4 Boston, MA 02114 / US | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr. Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH, Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02709117.2 | 22.01.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002US01707 | Priority number, date | US20010768870 | 24.01.2001 Original published format: US 768870 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02058697 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1363625 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/415, A61K31/155, A61K31/00, G01N33/574, A61P35/00 | [2004/16] | CPC: |
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/415, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/415, A61K31/135 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2003/48] | A61K31/415 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARZNEIMITTELKOMBINATIONEN (Z.B. EIN BENZIMIDAZOL UND EIN PENTAMIDIN) ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEOPLASTISCHEN STÖRUNGEN | [2003/48] | English: | COMBINATIONS OF DRUGS (E.G., A BENZIMIDAZOLE AND PENTAMIDINE) FOR THE TREATMENT OF NEOPLASTIC DISORDERS | [2003/48] | French: | COMBINAISONS DE MEDICAMENTS (P. EX. UN BENZIMIDAZOLE ET PENTAMIDINE) DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES NEOPLASIQUES | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 21.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 21.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 18.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/21] | 05.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - MAKULU D R ET AL, "EFFECTS OF PENTAMIDINE UPON MURINE LEUKEMIA AND THE WALKER 256 CARCINOMA (W256)", PHARMACOLOGIST, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTIC, US, (1974), vol. 16, no. 2, ISSN 0031-7004, page 105, XP001095144 [X] 1-25 * abstract * | [X] - POURGHOLAMI MOHAMMAD HOSSEIN ET AL, "In vitro inhibition of human liver cancer cells by albendazole", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, & 91ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH.; SAN FRANCISCO, CALIFORNIA, USA; APRIL 01-05, 2000, (200003), no. 41, ISSN 0197-016X, page 656, XP001179562 [X] 1-25 * abstract * | [X] - RAM S ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF CERTAIN ALKYL 5-(ALKOXYCARBONYL)-1H-BENZIMIDAZOLE-2-CARBAMATES AND RELATED DERIVATIVES: A NEW CLASS OF POTENTIAL ANTINEOPLASTIC AND ANTIFILARIAL AGENTS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1992), vol. 35, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 539 - 547, XP002056332 [X] 1-25 * abstract; Tables I-V; p.543-44, left hand col., Antitumor Results and Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00081a016 | [X] - "ACTIVITY OF BENZIMIDAZOLE CARBAMATES AGAINST L1210 MOUSE LEUKAEMIA CELLS: CORRELATION WITH IN VITRO TUBULIN POLYMERIZATION ASSAY", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, PERGAMON, OXFORD, GB, (1985), vol. 34, no. 19, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 3603 - 3605, XP001088887 [X] 1-25 * Abstract; Table 1; Results and Discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-2952(85)90742-7 | International search | [A] - CHARLES ET AL., "Echinococcal infection of the spine with neural involvement", EMBASE, Database accession no. 88127571, XP002950843 | [ ] - SPINE, (1988), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 47 - 49 | [A] - AYUB ET AL., "Inhibition of testicular 17.alpha.-hydroxylase and 17,20-lyase but not 3.beta.-hydroxysteroid dehydrogenase-isomerase or 17.beta.-hydroxysteroid oxidoreductase by ketoconazole and other imidazole drugs", CAPLUS, Database accession no. 1988:15796, XP002950844 | [ ] - J. STEROID BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 521 - 531 | [A] - WILSON ET AL., "Alveolar hydatid disease. A review of clinical features of 33 indigenous cases of echinococcus multilocularis infection in Alaskan Eskimos", EMBASE, Database accession no. 81053181, XP002950845 | [ ] - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF TROPICAL MEDICINE AND HYGIENE, (1980), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 1340 - 1355 | Examination | WO9632107 | WO9851304 | US5900429 | - DELATOUR P AND RICHARD Y, "Propriétés embryotoxiques et antimitotiques en série benzimidazole", THÉRAPIE, (1976), vol. 31, pages 505 - 515, XP001071185 | - ANEES M. AND STEVEN F.S., "Inhibition of a tumour protease with 3,4-dichloroisocoumarin, pentamidine isethionate and guandidino derivatives", JOURNAL OF ENZYME INHIBITION, (1994), vol. 8, pages 213 - 221, XP008007332 | - PRAVEEN REDDY B.S. ET AL, "Synthetic DNA minor grove-binding drugs", PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, (1999), vol. 84, pages 1 - 111, XP000984832 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0163-7258(99)00021-2 |