EP1366584 - METHOD FOR TIME SLOT SYNCHRONIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/49] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DEMODULATOR STATE CONTROLLER | ||
[2007/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HARRIS CORPORATION 1025 West NASA Boulevard, Mail Stop 23 Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | [2008/02] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Harris Corporation 1025 West NASA Boulevard, Mail Stop 23 Melbourne, FL 32919 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRESTON, Shawn, E. 17611 S.E. 46th Place Bellevue, WA 98006 / US | 02 /
FREDERICK, Daniel, J. 2901 167th Street, S.E. Bothell, WA 98012 / US | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02709322.8 | 06.02.2002 | [2003/49] | WO2002US03193 | Priority number, date | US20010266475P | 06.02.2001 Original published format: US 266475 P | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02063805 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1366584 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1366584 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/00, H04J3/06, H04J3/07 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
H04J3/0602 (EP);
H04B7/2123 (EP);
H04B7/2659 (EP);
H04J3/0608 (EP);
H04J3/1694 (EP);
H04L47/15 (EP);
H04L47/30 (EP);
H04L47/70 (EP);
H04L47/762 (EP);
H04L47/824 (EP);
H04L7/04 (EP);
H04L7/042 (EP);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04H20/28 (EP);
H04W28/14 (EP);
H04W72/543 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR EINE ZEITSCHLITZSYNCHRONISIERUNG | [2007/33] | English: | METHOD FOR TIME SLOT SYNCHRONIZATION | [2007/33] | French: | PROCEDE RELATIF A LA SYNCHRONISATION D'INTERVALLES DE TEMPS | [2007/33] |
Former [2003/49] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE DEMODULATORZUSTANDSSTEUERUNG | ||
Former [2003/49] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DEMODULATOR STATE CONTROLLER | ||
Former [2003/49] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE RELATIFS A UN CONTROLEUR D'ETAT DE DEMODULATEUR | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2003 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 20.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.01.2008 | BE | 09.01.2008 | CH | 09.01.2008 | CY | 09.01.2008 | DK | 09.01.2008 | FI | 09.01.2008 | IT | 09.01.2008 | LI | 09.01.2008 | NL | 09.01.2008 | TR | 09.01.2008 | IE | 06.02.2008 | LU | 06.02.2008 | MC | 28.02.2008 | SE | 09.04.2008 | GR | 10.04.2008 | ES | 20.04.2008 | PT | 09.06.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
TR | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
LU | 06.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
LU | 06.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
IT | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
CY | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
IE | 06.02.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
DK | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2008 | ||
SE | 09.04.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
BE | 09.01.2008 | ||
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
PT | 09.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 09.01.2008 | |
CH | 09.01.2008 | ||
FI | 09.01.2008 | ||
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CH | 09.01.2008 | |
LI | 09.01.2008 | ||
NL | 09.01.2008 | ||
ES | 20.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | NL | 09.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4852090 (BORTH DAVID E [US]) [X] 1,3,12,14,26,27 * abstract * * columns 6-12 * * figures 3a,3b,3c,4a,4b *; | [X]US5177740 (TOY RAYMOND L [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * abstract * * columns 1-3,5-7 * * figures 3a,3b,3c,4 *; | [X] - NEUNER HK BILITZA H ET AL, "SYNCHRONISATION EINER MOBILSTATION IM GMS-SYSTEM DMCS 900 (D-NETZ) SYNCHRONISATION OF MOBILE STATION IN GMS TDMA MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM DMCS 900 (D-NETZ)", FREQUENZ, SCHIELE UND SCHON GMBH. BERLIN, DE, (199303), vol. 47, no. 3/4, ISSN 0016-1136, pages 66 - 72, XP000363421 [X] 1,12,26,27 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5072445 (NAWATA HIZURU [JP]); | [Y]US5768269 (RAKIB SELIM SHLOMO [US], et al); | [Y]US5809009 (MATSUOKA AKIHIKO [JP], et al) |