EP1368059 - METHODS OF INDUCING ORGAN TRANSPLANT TOLERANCE AND CORRECTING HEMOGLOBINOPATHIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emory University 2009 Ridgewood Drive Atlanta, Georgia 30322 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Emory University 2009 Ridgewood Drive Atlanta, Georgia 30322 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSEN, Christian, P. 2727 Briarlake Woods Way Atlanta, GA 30345 / US | 02 /
PEARSON, Thomas, C. 1198 Cliffton Road Atlanta, GA 30307 / US | 03 /
WALLER, Edmund, K. 890 Los Angeles Avenue Atlanta, GA 30306 / US | 04 /
ADAMS, Andrew, B. 4305 Paxton Lane 1611 Milburn, GA 30047 / US | [2003/50] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/23] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/50] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner (GbR), Patentanwälte, Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02709422.6 | 25.01.2002 | [2003/50] | WO2002US03780 | Priority number, date | US20010264528P | 26.01.2001 Original published format: US 264528 P | US20010303142P | 05.07.2001 Original published format: US 303142 P | [2003/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02058729 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1368059 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
C07K14/70521 (EP,US);
A61K35/28 (EP,US);
A61K39/39541 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/28, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/50] | Extension states | AL | 25.08.2003 | LT | 25.08.2003 | LV | 25.08.2003 | MK | 25.08.2003 | RO | 25.08.2003 | SI | 25.08.2003 | Title | German: | METHODEN ZUR INDUKTION DER ORGANSTRANSPLANTAT-TOLERANZ UND ZUR KORREKTUR VON HÄMOGLOBINOPATHIEN | [2003/50] | English: | METHODS OF INDUCING ORGAN TRANSPLANT TOLERANCE AND CORRECTING HEMOGLOBINOPATHIES | [2003/50] | French: | PROCEDES POUR INDUIRE LA TOLERANCE DE TRANSPLANTATIONS D'ORGANE ET CORRIGER LES HEMOGLOBINOPATHIES | [2003/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 25.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 22.12.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 16.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/37] | 19.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |