EP1367652 - SOLAR CELL MODULE AND ITS INSTALLING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd. 4-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohte-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd 4-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Oote-machi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OJIMA, Satoyuki, c/o SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI CO., LTD. Isobe R & D Center, 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 02 /
OHTSUKA, Hiroyuki, c/o SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI CO., LTD Isobe R & D Center, 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Masatoshi, SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI CO., LTD. Isobe R & D Center, 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 04 /
WATABE, Takenori, c/o SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI CO., LTD. Isobe R & D Center, 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | 05 /
ABE, Takao, c/o SHIN-ETSU HANDOTAI CO., LTD. IsobeR & D Center, 13-1, Isobe 2-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0196 / JP | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Bernhard Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | Wagner, Bernhard Peter ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02710391.0 | 30.01.2002 | [2003/49] | WO2002JP00703 | Priority number, date | JP20010025681 | 01.02.2001 Original published format: JP 2001025681 | JP20010079527 | 19.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001079527 | [2003/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02061848 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1367652 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/042 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
H02S20/20 (KR);
F24S30/425 (EP,US);
H01L31/02 (EP,US);
H01L31/035281 (EP,US);
H01L31/03529 (EP,US);
H01L31/042 (KR);
H02S20/23 (EP,US);
H02S20/24 (EP,US);
H02S20/30 (EP,US);
F24S2030/16 (EP,US);
Y02B10/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/49] | Title | German: | SOLARZELLENMODUL UND INSTALLATIONSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2003/49] | English: | SOLAR CELL MODULE AND ITS INSTALLING METHOD | [2003/49] | French: | MODULE DE CELLULES SOLAIRES ET SON PROCEDE D'INSTALLATION | [2003/49] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2003 | Translation filed | 26.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 26.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/49] | 19.01.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS5664252 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO, et al); | [Y]US4379944 (BORDEN PETER G, et al); | [Y]US4453030 (DAVID GERARD R [FR], et al); | [Y]JPH0379087 (SHARP KK); | [Y]DE4033658 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]JPH0682865U ; | [Y]US5704992 (WILLEKE GERHARD [DE], et al); | [Y]US6172297 (HEZEL RUDOLF [DE], et al); | [Y] - HEZEL ET AL., "A new strategy for the fabrication of cost-effective silicon solar cells", RENEWABLE ENERGY, (199805), vol. 14, no. 1-4, pages 83 - 88, XP004126823 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-1481(98)00051-2 | [Y] - HEZEL ET AL., "Next generation of industrial silicon solar cells with efficiencies above 20%", PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE 2000. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE TWENTY-EIGHTH IEEE, (200009), pages 184 - 187, XP002909318 |