EP1356451 - ANNULAR ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 19.09.2007 [2007/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Angelsen, Bjorn A. J. Bugges veg 4B 7051 Trondheim / NO | For all designated states Johansen, Tonni F. Osloveien 6 7018 Trondheim / NO | [2005/46] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states ANGELSEN, Bjorn A. J. Bugges veg 4B 7051 Trondheim / NO | ||
For all designated states Johansen, Tonni F. Osloveien 6 7018 Trondheim / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Howe, Steven, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 02710570.9 | 07.01.2002 | [2003/44] | WO2002NO00006 | Priority number, date | US20010259887P | 05.01.2001 Original published format: US 259887 P | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02054379 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1356451 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1356451 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/30 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
B06B1/0625 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RINGFÖRMIGES ARRAY | [2003/44] | English: | ANNULAR ARRAY | [2003/44] | French: | RESEAU ANNULAIRE | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 11.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   18.07.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.11.2005 | ES | 27.02.2006 | [2007/38] |
Former [2006/50] | ES | 27.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4276779 (DAVIS JR LUTHER) [X] 1-3 [Y] 4,7; | [XA]EP0373603 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 [A] 4,5,7; | [YA]US5938608 (BIEGER JOHANNES [DE], et al) [Y] 4,7 [A] 1-3,5; | [A]US5922962 (ISHRAK SYED OMAR [US], et al) [A] 1-4; | [A]US5375600 (MELTON JR HEWLETT E [US], et al) [A] 1-3; | [A]EP0310380 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 7,8 |