EP1363512 - BEVERAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Frigo, Peter Rummelhardtgasse 6/25 1090 Wien / AT | For all designated states Ertl, Adolf Hardeggasse 69/13/10 1220 Wien / AT | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Gibler, Ferdinand Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte OG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/48] | Gibler, Ferdinand, Dipl.Ing. Dr. techn. Patentanwalt Dorotheergasse 7 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 02710675.6 | 18.02.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002AT00053 | Priority number, date | AT20010000281 | 22.02.2001 Original published format: AT 2812001 | [2003/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02065861 | Date: | 29.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1363512 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1363512 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/52, A23L1/30, A23L1/305 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23L33/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRÄNK | [2003/48] | English: | BEVERAGE | [2003/48] | French: | BOISSON | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 04.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.04.2006 | FI | 19.04.2006 | FR | 19.04.2006 | GB | 19.04.2006 | IE | 19.04.2006 | IT | 19.04.2006 | NL | 19.04.2006 | TR | 19.04.2006 | DK | 19.07.2006 | SE | 19.07.2006 | GR | 20.07.2006 | ES | 30.07.2006 | PT | 19.09.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | CY | 19.04.2006 | |
FI | 19.04.2006 | ||
FR | 19.04.2006 | ||
GB | 19.04.2006 | ||
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
FR | 19.04.2006 | ||
GB | 19.04.2006 | ||
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
GB | 19.04.2006 | ||
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
GR | 20.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
GB | 19.04.2006 | ||
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
IT | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
GB | 19.04.2006 | ||
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
NL | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
IE | 19.04.2006 | ||
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
DK | 19.07.2006 | ||
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
PT | 19.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 19.04.2006 | |
SE | 19.07.2006 | ||
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 19.07.2006 | |
ES | 30.07.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 19.07.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]CN1167588 ; | [PA]KR20010100562 ; | [A]US5248515 (PAYTON SHARON B [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * claims 1,26 *; | [A]GB2285578 (LEA LEILANI [GB]) [A] 1,2 * claim 12 *; | [A]WO0103520 (OCEAN SPRAY CRANBERRIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 69, Database accession no. 2001-603044, XP002202676 & CN1167588 A 19971217 (CHEN G) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - AVIRAM M ET AL, "Pomegranat juice consumption inhibits serum angiotensin converting enzyme activity and reduces systolic blood pressure", ATHEROSCELOSIS, (2001), vol. 158, no. 1, pages 195 - 198, XP002202674 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9150(01)00412-9 | [PA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 31, Database accession no. 2002-265119, XP002202675 & KR20010100562 A 20011114 (CHOI J) [PA] 1,5 * abstract * |