EP1374126 - ANALYSIS OF BUSINESS INNOVATION POTENTIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.08.2007 [2007/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wave Global Pty Ltd 24 Melbourne Hill Road Warrandyte, Victoria 3113 / AU | [2004/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURBNER, Darryl 24 Melbourne Hill Road Warrandyte, Victoria 3113 / AU | [2004/01] | Representative(s) | Gillam, Francis Cyril SANDERSON & CO. 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Gillam, Francis Cyril SANDERSON & CO. 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 02710683.0 | 05.02.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002AU00111 | Priority number, date | AU1979PR00128 | 06.02.2001 Original published format: AU PR012879 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02063510 | Date: | 15.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1374126 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 15.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/60 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (KR);
G06Q10/0637 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSE DES GESCHÄFTSINNOVATIONSPOTENTIALS | [2004/01] | English: | ANALYSIS OF BUSINESS INNOVATION POTENTIAL | [2004/01] | French: | ANALYSE D'UN POTENTIEL D'INNOVATION COMMERCIALE | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Search fee paid | 22.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 28.07.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 06.06.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [X]WO0041110 (ALESSANDRO ALEX D [US]); | [A]WO0046721 (NVAL SOLUTIONS INC [US], et al) |