EP1356117 - POLYNUCLEOTIDES FOR USE AS TAGS AND TAG COMPLEMENTS, MANUFACTURE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luminex Molecular Diagnostics, Inc. 439 University Avenue, Suite 900 Toronto, ON M5G 1Y8 / CA | [2012/04] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states TM Bioscience Corporation 439 University Avenue, Suite 1100 Toronto, Ontario M5G 1Y8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANCOSKA, Petr 901 Hinman Avenue 2C Evanston, IL 60202 / US | 02 /
JANOTA, Vit Ovenecka 27 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | 03 /
BENIGHT, Albert, S. 1630 Valley View Drive Schaumburg, IL 60193 / US | 04 /
BULLOCK, Richard, S. 3500 North Lake Shore Drive Chicago, IL 60657 / US | 05 /
RICCELLI, Peter, V. 16830 Richards Drive Tinley Park, IL 60477 / US | 06 /
KOBLER, Daniel 33 Wood Street, Apartment 1102 Toronto, Ontario M4Y 2P8 / CA | 07 /
FIELDHOUSE, Daniel 7 Chaplin Court Bolton, Ontario L7E 5Y1 / CA | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Williams, Aylsa, et al D Young & Co LLP Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Williams, Aylsa, et al D Young & Co Briton House Briton Street Southampton SO14 3EB / GB | ||
Former [2003/44] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02710715.0 | 25.01.2002 | [2003/44] | WO2002CA00087 | Priority number, date | US20010263710P | 25.01.2001 Original published format: US 263710 P | US20010303799P | 10.07.2001 Original published format: US 303799 P | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02059354 | Date: | 01.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1356117 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
G16B30/10 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
C40B20/04 (EP,US);
G16B25/20 (EP,US);
G16B30/00 (EP,US);
G16B25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Extension states | AL | 20.08.2003 | LT | 20.08.2003 | LV | 20.08.2003 | MK | 20.08.2003 | RO | 20.08.2003 | SI | 20.08.2003 | Title | German: | POLYNUKLEOTIDE ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS TAGS UND TAGKOMPLEMENTE, HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2003/44] | English: | POLYNUCLEOTIDES FOR USE AS TAGS AND TAG COMPLEMENTS, MANUFACTURE AND USE THEREOF | [2003/44] | French: | POLYNUCLEOTIDES POUVANT ETRE UTILISES COMME MARQUEURS OU COMPLEMENTS DE MARQUEURS, PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION DESDITS POLYNUCLEOTIDES | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 30.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/20] | 10.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/20] | Divisional application(s) | EP10012192.0 / EP2325336 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2006 | Request for further processing for: | 09.03.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 12.03.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.03.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0698792 (NISSUI PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 3,4,18,35,36,59-69,82-91,100-106 * abstract * * page 3, line 51 - page 6, line 33; figures 1-19; examples 1,2 *; | [DX]US5654413 (BRENNER SYDNEY [GB]) [DX] 3,4,18,35,36,59-69,82-91 * abstract * * column 4, line 9 - line 51 * * column 6, line 30 - column 9, line 21 * * column 27-30: Appendix I; column 16, line 59 - column 19, line 54; table II *; | [X]EP0799897 (AFFYMETRIX INC [US]) [X] 3,4,18,35,36,59-69,82-91 * abstract * * page 2, line 36 - page 4, line 1 * * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 14 * * page 8, line 56 - page 14, line 21; figure 4; examples 2-4; claims 1-25 *; | [X]WO0058516 (WHITEHEAD BIOMEDICAL INST [US], et al) [X] 3,4,18,35,36,59-69,82-103,105,106 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 22; figures 2-7 * * page 24, line 1 - page 26, line 23; examples 5-7; claims 1-3,21-25; table 1 *; | [PXD]WO0159151 (TM BIOSCIENCE CORP [CA], et al) [PXD] 3,4,18,35,36,59-69,82-91 * the whole document *; | [E]WO02053728 (ELITRA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [E] 3,4,18,35,36,59-69,82-91* SEQ ID NOs: 2424, 3783,2892,3126,1477 *; | [X] - NIEMEYER CHRISTOF M ET AL, "DNA-directed immobilization: Efficient, reversible, and site-selective surface binding of proteins by means of covalent DNA-streptavidin conjugates", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, (19990301), vol. 268, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 54 - 63, XP002176566 [X] 3,4,18,35,36,59-69,82-91,100-106 * abstract * * page 60, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 62, column 2, paragraph 1; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1998.3017 | [AD] - SOUTHERN E ET AL, "MOLECULAR INTERACTIONS ON MICROARRAYS", NATURE GENETICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199901), vol. 21, no. SUPPL, ISSN 1061-4036, pages 5 - 9, XP000865979 [AD] 3,4,18,35,36,59-69,82-106 * page 7, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 8, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/4429 |