EP1352061 - METHOD FOR INHIBITING THE EXPRESSION OF A TARGET GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Opposition rejected | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alnylam Europe AG Schleissheimer Str. 25 80333 München / DE | [2007/38] |
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Alnylam Europe AG Fritz-Hornschuch-Strasse 9 95326 Kulmbach / DE | ||
Former [2004/06] | For all designated states Ribopharma AG Fritz-Hornschuch-Strasse 9 95326 Kulmbach / DE | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Ribopharma AG Universitätsstrasse 30 95447 Bayreuth / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KREUTZER, Roland Glotzdorf 26 95466 Weidenberg / DE | 02 /
LIMMER, Stephan Am Buttergraben 11 95326 Kulmbach / DE | 03 /
LIMMER, Sylvia Am Buttergraben 11 95326 Kulmbach / DE | 04 /
HADWIGER, Philipp Rotsteinweg 16a 95326 Kulmbach / DE | [2007/28] |
Former [2005/39] | 01 /
KREUTZER, Roland Glotzdorf 26 95466 Weidenberg / DE | ||
02 /
LIMMER, Stephan Am Buttergraben 11 95326 Kulmbach / DE | |||
03 /
LIMMER, Sylvia Am Buttergraben 11 95326 Kulmbach / DE | |||
04 /
HADWIGER, Philipp Schlesierstr. 6 96264 Altenkunstadt / DE | |||
Former [2003/50] | 01 /
KREUTZER, Roland Glotzdorf 26 95466 Weidenberg / DE | ||
02 /
LIMMER, Stephan Am Buttergraben 11 95326 Kulmbach / DE | |||
03 /
LIMMER, Sylvia Am Buttergraben 11 95326 Kulmbach / DE | |||
04 /
HADWIGER, Philipp Almstr.5 95488 Bayreuth / DE | |||
Former [2003/42] | 01 /
KREUTZER, Roland Universitätsstrasse 30 95447 Bayreuth / DE | ||
02 /
LIMMER, Stephan Universitätsstrasse 30 95447 Bayreuth / DE | |||
03 /
ROST, Sylvia Universitätsstrasse 30 95447 Bayreuth / DE | |||
04 /
HADWIGER, Philipp Universitätsstrasse 30 95447 Bayreuth / DE | Representative(s) | Wachenfeld, Joachim, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Wachenfeld, Joachim, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Wachenfeld, Joachim, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/06] | Gassner, Wolfgang, Dr., et al Patentanwalt, Nägelsbachstrasse 49a 91052 Erlangen / DE | ||
Former [2003/42] | Gassner, Wolfgang, Dr. Patentanwalt, Nägelsbachstrasse 49a 91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02710786.1 | 09.01.2002 | [2003/42] | WO2002EP00152 | Priority number, date | DE2001100586 | 09.01.2001 Original published format: DE 10100586 | DE2001155280 | 26.10.2001 Original published format: DE 10155280 | DE2001158411 | 29.11.2001 Original published format: DE 10158411 | DE2001160151 | 07.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10160151 | [2003/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02055693 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1352061 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1352061 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1352061 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11 | [2003/42] | CPC: |
C12N15/1138 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/1131 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (EP,US);
C12N2310/53 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG DER EXPRESSION EINE ZIELGENS | [2003/42] | English: | METHOD FOR INHIBITING THE EXPRESSION OF A TARGET GENE | [2003/42] | French: | PROCEDE POUR INHIBER L'EXPRESSION D'UN GENE CIBLE | [2003/42] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/42] | 06.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.02.2007
09.03.2007
ADMISSIBLE Sirna Therapeutics 1700 Owens Street 4th Floor San Francisco CA 94158 / US Opponents representative Weber, Martin, et al, et al Jones Day Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2012/45] |
Former [2007/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.02.2007
Sirna Therapeutics 1700 Owens Street 4th Floor San Francisco CA 94158 / US Opponents representative Bezzubova, Olga, et al, et al Uexküll & Stolberg Patentanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 9 D-80539 München / DE | 05.04.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.10.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.08.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 11.03.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/18] | Appeal following opposition | 23.10.2009 | Appeal received No. T2104/09 | 04.01.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.03.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.05.2006 | FI | 31.05.2006 | NL | 31.05.2006 | TR | 31.05.2006 | DK | 31.08.2006 | SE | 31.08.2006 | GR | 01.09.2006 | ES | 11.09.2006 | PT | 31.10.2006 | IT | 09.01.2007 | LU | 09.01.2007 | BE | 31.01.2007 | FR | 31.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/41] | CY | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
IT | 09.01.2007 | ||
LU | 09.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FR | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2009/38] | CY | 31.05.2006 | |
FI | 31.05.2006 | ||
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
LU | 09.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FR | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2009/27] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
FR | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
GR | 01.09.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
BE | 31.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
NL | 31.05.2006 | ||
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
PT | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
DK | 31.08.2006 | ||
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 31.05.2006 | |
SE | 31.08.2006 | ||
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 31.08.2006 | |
ES | 11.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 31.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9401550 (HYBRIDON INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO9805770 (DEUTCHES KREBSFORSCHUNGSZENTRU [DE], et al) [Y] 1-240 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9932619 (CARNEGIE INST OF WASHINGTON [US], et al) [Y] 1-240 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0044895 (KREUTZER ROLAND [DE], et al) [X] 1-240 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0044914 (MED COLLEGE GEORGIA RES INST [US], et al) [Y] 1-240 * the whole document *; | [Y] - ZAMORE PHILLIP D ET AL, "RNAi: Double-stranded RNA directs the ATP-dependent cleavage of mRNA at 21 to 23 nucleotide intervals", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, (20000331), vol. 101, no. 1, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 25 - 33, XP002208683 [Y] 1-240 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)80620-0 | [Y] - BASS BRENDA L, "Double-stranded RNA as a template for gene silencing", CELL, CELL PRESS, CAMBRIDGE, NA, US, (20000428), vol. 101, no. 3, ISSN 0092-8674, pages 235 - 238, XP002194756 [Y] 1-240 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(02)71133-1 | [Y] - UHLMANN E ET AL, "ANTISENSE OLIGONUCLEOTIDES: A NEW THERAPEUTIC PRINCIPLE", CHEMICAL REVIEWS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, US, (19900601), vol. 90, no. 4, ISSN 0009-2665, pages 543 - 584, XP000141412 [Y] 20-30,60-70,99-109,140-150,180-190,219-229 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr00102a001 | [Y] - PARRISH S., FLEENOR J., ET AL., "Functional Anatomy of a dsRNA trigger: differential requirement for the two trigger strands in RNA interference.", MOL. CELL, (200011), vol. 6, pages 1077 - 187, XP002226361 [Y] 1-240 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(00)00106-4 | [YP] - AMBROS VICTOR, "Dicing up RNAs", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (20010803), vol. 293, no. 5531, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 811 - 813, XP002183122 [YP] 1-240 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1064400 | [YP] - ELBASHIR SAYDA M ET AL, "RNA interference is mediated by 21- and 22-nucleotide RNAs", GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, NEW YORK, US, (20010115), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 188 - 200, XP002204651 [YP] 1-240 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.862301 | Examination | WO0175164 | WO0244321 |