EP1364025 - A NOVEL GENE BNO1 MAPPING TO CHROMOSOME 16Q24.3 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/48] | A NOVEL GENE BN01 MAPPING TO CHROMOSOME 16Q24.3 | ||
[2011/04] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bionomics Limited 31 Dalgleish Street Thebarton, S.A. 5031 / AU | [2003/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CALLEN, David, Frederick 40 Clifton Street Malvern, S.A. 5061 / AU | 02 /
POWELL, Jason, Anthony 148 Diagonal Road Warradale, S.A. 5046 / AU | 03 /
KREMMIDIOTIS, Gabriel 1 Nina Court Aberfoyle Park, S.A. 5159 / AU | 04 /
GARDNER, Alison, Elaine 8 Balmoral Avenue North Brighton, S.A. 5048 / AU | 05 /
CRAWFORD, Joanna 75 Old Mount Barker Road Stirling, S.A. 5152 / AU | 06 /
BAIS, Anthony, John 20 Broughton Avenue Kurralta Park, S.A. 5037 / AU | 07 /
KOCHETKOVA, Marina 15 Arthur Street Medindie, S.A. 5081 / AU | [2003/48] | Representative(s) | Banford, Paul Clifford HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [2014/39] |
Former [2013/42] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | ||
Former [2013/31] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2011/47] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | ||
Former [2011/38] | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2011/31] | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | ||
Former [2009/44] | Martin, David John, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 5th Floor 14 South Parade Leeds LS1 5QS / GB | ||
Former [2003/48] | Banford, Paul Clifford, et al Marks & Clerk, 43 Park Place Leeds LS1 2RY / GB | Application number, filing date | 02711634.2 | 31.01.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002AU00096 | Priority number, date | AU2001PP02783 | 31.01.2001 Original published format: AU PP278301 | [2003/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02061081 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1364025 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1364025 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 08.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N15/63, C07K14/435, C07K16/18, A61K48/00, A61K39/395 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
C12N9/93 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Title | German: | NEUES, AUF CHROMOSOM 16Q24.3 KARTIERTES GEN BNO1 | [2011/02] | English: | A NOVEL GENE BNO1 MAPPING TO CHROMOSOME 16Q24.3 | [2011/04] | French: | UNE NOUVELLE CARTOGRAPHIE DU GENE BNO1 AU CHROMOSOME 16Q24.3 | [2011/04] |
Former [2003/48] | "NEUES, AUF CHROMOSOM 16Q24.3 KARTIERTES GEN BNO1" | ||
Former [2003/48] | A NOVEL GENE BN01 MAPPING TO CHROMOSOME 16Q24.3 | ||
Former [2003/48] | UNE NOUVELLE CARTOGRAPHIE DU GENE BN01 AU CHROMOSOME 16Q24.3 | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 27.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 29.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2004 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 22.09.2004 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 16.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.2014
ADMISSIBLE A. Schweizer Stiftung/Deut. Tierschutz./GeN e.V./ Ges.f. öko/J.Goodall Inst./Menschen f. Tierrechte/ SAG/TASSO/WCF/R.Tippe/C.T Frohschammerstrasse 14 80807 München / DE | [2014/24] | 22.05.2014 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 02.06.2014 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 13.06.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.12.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 06.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 11.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.02.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2016/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | LU | 31.01.2014 | BE | 31.01.2016 | IT | 31.01.2016 | ES | 01.02.2016 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/33] | CH | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 31.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IT | 31.01.2016 | ||
ES | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | CH | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 31.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CH | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 31.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 31.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
LU | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 19.06.2013 | |
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 02.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO0153312 (HYSEQ INC [US], et al) [PX] 2-4,6,8-13,15,16,18-44 * SEQ ID NO: 6499 (accession: AAM41518);; claims 1-3,18,19,27,28 *; | [E]WO02081514 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [E] 2-4,6,8-13,15,16,18-44 * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 17 ** Human FBXO31-10 SEQ ID NO: 42 (accession: AX577700) SEQ ID NO: 30 (accession: AX577688) *; | [A] - DROBNJAK MARIJA ET AL, "Altered expression of p27 and Skp2 proteins in prostate cancer of African-American patients.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH: AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. UNITED STATES JUL 2003, (200307), vol. 9, no. 7, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 2613 - 2619, XP002271709 [A] 1-44 * page 2613, column R, paragraph 5; table 1 * | International search | [X] - KOEHRER K. ET AL., "Homo sapiens mRNA; cDNA DKFZp434B027 (from clone DKFZp434B027) partial cds", PROTEIN, (19990915), Database accession no. (CAB55929), XP008096945 | [XP] - PROTEIN, Database accession no. (AAH12748), XP008096949 | [XP] - PROTEIN, Database accession no. (AAL55855), XP008096946 | [X] - PROTEIN, Database accession no. (BAA95069), XP008096947 |