EP1363564 - WRIST PROSTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guérard, Jean-Louis 74, rue du Centre 1025 St-Sulpice / CH | For all designated states Pflug, Léopold 1175 Lavigny / CH | For all designated states Clinique Chirurgicale et Permanence de Longeraie S.A. 9, avenue de la Gare 1003 Lausanne / CH | [2005/23] |
Former [2003/48] | For all designated states Guérard, Jean-Louis 74, rue du Centre 1025 St-Sulpice / CH | ||
For all designated states Pflug, Léopold 1175 Lavigny / CH | |||
For all designated states Egloff, Daniel 9, avenue de la Gare 1003 Lausanne / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guérard, Jean-Louis 74, rue du Centre 1025 St-Sulpice / CH | 02 /
Pflug, Léopold 1175 Lavigny / CH | 03 /
Egloff, Daniel 9, avenue de la Gare 1003 Lausanne / CH | [2005/23] |
Former [2003/48] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [2003/48] | Ganguillet, Cyril, et al ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet & Humphrey Avenue du Théâtre 16 Case postale 2065 1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 02711744.9 | 27.02.2002 | [2003/48] | WO2002CH00115 | Priority number, date | CH20010039101 | 02.03.2001 Original published format: CH 391012001 | [2003/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02069853 | Date: | 12.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1363564 | Date: | 26.11.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1363564 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/16] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1363564 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/42 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
A61F2/4261 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30069 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30153 (EP,US);
A61F2002/302 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30224 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30233 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30253 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30354 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30357 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30367 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30378 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30383 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30487 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30492 (EP,US);
A61F2002/305 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30563 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30594 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30624 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30632 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30662 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3082 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30878 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30891 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3096 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30975 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0019 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0065 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0069 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDGELENKPROTHESE | [2003/48] | English: | WRIST PROSTHESIS | [2003/48] | French: | PROTHESE DE POIGNET | [2003/48] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2003 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 01.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.04.2005 | CY | 20.04.2005 | FI | 20.04.2005 | IE | 20.04.2005 | NL | 20.04.2005 | TR | 20.04.2005 | DK | 20.07.2005 | GR | 20.07.2005 | SE | 20.07.2005 | ES | 31.07.2005 | PT | 20.09.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | AT | 20.04.2005 | |
FI | 20.04.2005 | ||
IE | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
TR | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | AT | 20.04.2005 | |
FI | 20.04.2005 | ||
IE | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.04.2005 | |
FI | 20.04.2005 | ||
NL | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
ES | 31.07.2005 | ||
PT | 20.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.04.2005 | |
FI | 20.04.2005 | ||
DK | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 20.04.2005 | |
SE | 20.07.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 20.07.2005 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4100626 (WHITE ROBERT CHARLES) [Y] 1,2 * column W * [A] 8; | [A]US4229840 (GRISTINA ANTHONY G); | [YA]US4307473 (WEBER EDWARD R) [Y] 1,2 * column W * [A] 7; | [YA]EP0214773 (HARRINGTON ARTHRITIS RES [US]) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 7; | [A]US4714476 (RANAWAT CHITRANJAN S [US], et al); | [A]EP0454645 (MEDEVELOP AB [SE]); | [DA]FR2669214 (LODA ANTONIO GUILLERMO); | [DA]FR2681240 (TORNIER SA [FR]); | [A]WO9522945 (PLUS ENDOPROTHETIK AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO9857600 (BAEHLER ANDRE [CH], et al) | by applicant | FR2669214 | FR2681240 |