EP1358127 - IN SITU FORMED ANIONIC CLAY-CONTAINING BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [2003/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAMIRES, Dennis 1300 Colony Plaza Newport Beach, CA 92660 / US | 02 /
JONES, William 56 Lantree Crescent Cambridge CB2 2NJ / GB | 03 /
O'CONNOR, Paul Hogebrinkerweg 9 3871 KM Hoevelaken / NL | [2003/45] | Representative(s) | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Intellectual Property Department PO Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [2003/45] | Schalkwijk, Pieter Cornelis, et al Akzo Nobel N.V. Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 02711827.2 | 29.01.2002 | [2003/45] | WO2002EP01110 | Priority number, date | US20010267471P | 09.02.2001 Original published format: US 267471 P | EP20010200834 | 05.03.2001 Original published format: EP 01200834 | [2003/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02072474 | Date: | 19.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1358127 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1358127 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/00, C01G15/00, B01J21/16, C01B13/32 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
B01J20/10 (EP);
B01J23/007 (EP);
C04B33/04 (EP);
C09C1/42 (EP);
B01J21/16 (EP);
C01P2002/22 (EP);
C01P2002/32 (EP);
C01P2002/50 (EP);
C01P2002/70 (EP);
C01P2006/90 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/45] | Title | German: | IN-SITU HERGESTELLTE ANIONISCHE TONHALTENDE FORMKÖRPER | [2003/45] | English: | IN SITU FORMED ANIONIC CLAY-CONTAINING BODIES | [2003/45] | French: | CORPS CONTENANT DE L'ARGILE ANIONIQUE CRISTALLIN FORME IN SITU | [2003/45] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/45] | 24.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 13.10.2004 | LI | 13.10.2004 | TR | 13.10.2004 | GR | 13.01.2005 | CY | 29.01.2005 | LU | 29.01.2005 | MC | 31.01.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/11] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
LU | 29.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
TR | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
LI | 13.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4454244 (WOLTERMANN GERALD M [US]) [A] 1-23 * examples 1,2 *; | [DX]EP0278535 (AKZO NV [NL]) [DX] 14-16,18-21,23 * page 7, line 40 - page 8, line 50 *; | [PX]WO0112319 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [PX] 14-16,18-21,23 * page 2, line 20 - page 3, line 5; claims 1,22 * * page 9, lines 14-19 *; | [A] - LOPEZ-SALINAS ESTEBAN ET AL, "New gallium-substituted hydrotalcites: [ Mg1- xGax(OH)2] (CO3)x/2 DOT mH2O", J POROUS MATER;JOURNAL OF POROUS MATERIALS 1996 KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DORDRECHT, NETHERLANDS, (1996), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 169 - 174, XP008006008 [A] 1-23 * page 170, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01134028 |