EP1347812 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A VOLATILE SUBSTANCE BY EVAPORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lecoffre, Yves 2, place Apvril 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states LECOFFRE, Yves 2, place Apvril 38000 Grenoble / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/40] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | Casalonga, Axel BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02711920.5 | 04.01.2002 | [2003/40] | WO2002FR00027 | Priority number, date | FR20010000140 | 05.01.2001 Original published format: FR 0100140 | [2003/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02053248 | Date: | 11.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347812 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D1/00, B01D1/14, B01F3/02, B01F15/04 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
A61L9/035 (EP,US);
A61L9/042 (EP,US);
A61L9/122 (EP,US);
B01D1/00 (EP,US);
B01D1/14 (EP,US);
B01F23/12 (EP,US);
B01F23/191 (EP,US);
B01F35/2211 (EP,US);
B01F35/831 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FLÜCHTIGEN SUBSTANZ DURCH VERDAMPFEN | [2003/40] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FORMING A VOLATILE SUBSTANCE BY EVAPORATION | [2003/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR CONSTITUER PAR EVAPORATION UNE SUBSTANCE VOLATILE | [2003/40] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2003 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 02.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2006 | 31.01.2008 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CA1046931 ; | [A]RU2041377 ; | [A]JPS5587424 ; | [A]JPH11197227 ; | [A]US4035451 (TRINGALI DOMINICK) [A] 1,17 * figures 1-4; claims 1-7 *; | [A]GB1513080 (FR DE L AEROVAP COMP) [A] 1,7* the whole document *; | [YA]US6162734 (BERGMAN ERIC J [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7 * column W * [A] 8,14; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1979, no. 06, Database accession no. 1979-10034B, XP002192956 & CA1046931 A 19790123 (H.J.SCHLADITZ) [Y] 1,2,4,5,7 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 17, Database accession no. 1996-170351, XP002192957 & RU2041377 C 19950809 (B.I.VILENSKII) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800918), vol. 4, no. 133, & JP55087424 A 19800702 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991029), vol. 1999, no. 12, & JP11197227 A 19990727 (FUTABA CORP.) [A] 1,7 * abstract * | Examination | US724256 | US3711023 |