EP1483765 - MOX FUEL FABRICATION PROCESS FROM WEAPON PLUTONIUM FEED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belgonucleaire SA Avenue Ariane 4 1200 Bruxelles / BE | [2004/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANDERGHEYNST, Alain Rue de l'Yser 40 B-7370 Dour / BE | 02 /
PELCKMANS, Eduard Terlo 24 B-2460 Kasterlee / BE | 03 /
DE VLEESCHHAUWER, Marc Kwakkelstraat, 9 B-2480 Dessel / BE | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Gevers, François, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Gevers, François, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2004/50] | Gevers, François, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen S.A. Holidaystraat 5 1830 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 02712661.4 | 11.03.2002 | [2004/50] | WO2002BE00030 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03077262 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1483765 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1483765 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/62 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
G21C3/623 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [2006/23] |
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON MOX KERNBRENNSTOFF AUS WAFFENPLUTONIUM HERKUNFT | [2004/50] | English: | MOX FUEL FABRICATION PROCESS FROM WEAPON PLUTONIUM FEED | [2004/50] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE COMBUSTIBLE MOX A PARTIR DE CHARGES DE PLUTONIUM D'ARMES | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 01.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.06.2006 | FR | 07.06.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | DE | 08.09.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/38] | BE | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
DE | 08.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | BE | 07.06.2006 | |
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO0045394 (BELGONUCLEAIRE SA [BE], et al) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0103143 (BELGONUCLEAIRE SA [BE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A] - BERNARD H. ET AL., AIDA-MOX 1993-1996. Evaluation of Processes for the Fabrication ofI MOX-Fuel from Weapons-grade Plutonium, JAPAN, ATOMIC ENERGY SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO (JAPAN), (19971231), XP008014724 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - BLAIR, H.T. ET AL, Fabrication of mixed oxide fuel using plutonium from dismantled weapons., UNITED STATES, 1996. 3 P. MF AVAILABLE FROM INIS UNDER THE REPORT NUMBER;ALSO AVAILABLE FROM OSTI AS DE96014204; NTIS; US GOVT. PRINTING OFFICE DEP. CONFERENCE: WINTER MEETING OF THE AMERICAN NUCLEAR SOCIETY (ANS) AND THE EUROPEAN NUCLEAR SOCIETY (ENS), WASHINGTON,, XP002235077 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - KOLMAN, D. ET AL, THERMALLY-INDUCED GALLIUM REMOVAL FROM PLUTONIUM DIOXIDE FOR MOX FUEL PRODUCTION., UNITED STATES, 1 SEP 1999. 7 P AVAILABLE FROM INIS IN ELECTRONIC FORM;ALSO AVAILABLE FROM OSTI AS DE00768222; PURL: HTTPS://WWW.OSTI.GOV/SERVLETS/PURL/768222- QNFGNW/WEBVIEWABLE/., XP002235078 [A] 1 * the whole document * |