EP1381795 - HARMONIC DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oechsler Aktiengesellschaft Matthias-Oechsler-Strasse 9 91522 Ansbach / DE | [2004/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POEHLAU, Frank Dr.-Mack-Str. 36 90762 Fuerth / DE | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Führing, Dieter Avenariusstrasse 24 90409 Nürnberg / DE | [2004/04] | Application number, filing date | 02712945.1 | 13.03.2002 | [2004/04] | WO2002EP02757 | Priority number, date | DE2001120735 | 21.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10120735 | [2004/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02086353 | Date: | 31.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1381795 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1381795 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16H49/00 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
F16H49/001 (EP,US);
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
G01P3/487 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/04] | Title | German: | WELLGETRIEBE | [2004/04] | English: | HARMONIC DRIVE | [2004/04] | French: | REDUCTEUR A PLANETAIRE | [2004/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2003 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/04] | 10.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.05.2005 | FI | 11.05.2005 | IE | 11.05.2005 | IT | 11.05.2005 | NL | 11.05.2005 | TR | 11.05.2005 | DK | 11.08.2005 | GR | 11.08.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | ES | 22.08.2005 | PT | 19.10.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/38] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
IT | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
TR | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
IT | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
IE | 11.05.2005 | ||
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
NL | 11.05.2005 | ||
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
GR | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
PT | 19.10.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
DK | 11.08.2005 | ||
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 11.05.2005 | |
SE | 11.08.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2000009192 ; | [YA]JPH11295330 ; | [A]JPS62129717 ; | [X]US4506590 (MIKI MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 8, line 23 - line 30 * * column 9, line 28 - line 42 * * column 10, line 58 - column 11, line 2 * * figures 1,7,8 *; | [Y]US4809191 (DOMEIER WAYNE H [US], et al) [Y] 5,8,9,11 * abstract * * figures 4A,4B *; | [A]US4998084 (ALFF DENIS [FR]) [A] 6 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 9 * * figures 1-4 *; | [DA]DE29614738U (HIRN HELMUT DIPL ING [DE], et al) [DA] 3,6* figures 14-21 *; | [Y]US6084400 (STEINICH KLAUS-MANFRED [DE], et al) [Y] 7 * figures 1,5 * * column 4, line 23 - line 34 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000009192 A 20000111 (HARMONIC DRIVE SYST IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * [Y] 5,7-11 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000131), vol. 2000, no. 01, & JP11295330 A 19991029 (YAZAKI CORP) [Y] 10 * abstract * * figures 1,,2A,,2B,,5A,,5B, * [A] 5,7-9,11 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871117), vol. 011, no. 350, Database accession no. (P - 637), & JP62129717 A 19870612 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 6 * abstract * |