EP1372891 - APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING LIQUID METALS FROM A COLLECTION CONTAINER TO A RECEIVING CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teksid Aluminum S.r.l. Via Umberto II, 5 10022 Carmagnola (Torino) / IT | [2006/05] |
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states TEKSID ALUMINUM S.R.L. Via Umberto II, 5 10022 Carmagnola / IT | ||
Former [2004/01] | For all designated states Teksid Aluminium S.R.L. Via Umberto II, 5 10022 Carmagnola / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANCUSI, Andrea Corso Roma 21/2 I-10022 Carmagnola (Torino) / IT | [2005/50] |
Former [2004/01] | 01 /
MANCUSI, Andrea Corso Roma 21/2 I-10022 Carmagnola / IT | Representative(s) | Jacobacci, Guido, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/01] | Jacobacci, Guido, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A., Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02712955.0 | 22.03.2002 | [2004/01] | WO2002EP03270 | Priority number, date | IT2001TO00288 | 27.03.2001 Original published format: IT TO20010288 | [2004/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02076656 | Date: | 03.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1372891 | Date: | 02.01.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1372891 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/10, C21C7/10, B22D37/00 | [2004/01] | CPC: |
B22D11/113 (EP,US);
B22D37/00 (EP,US);
C21C7/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERFÜHREN FLÜSSIGEN METALLS AUS EINEM SAMMELBEHÄLTER ZU EINEM AUFNAHMEBEHÄLTER | [2004/01] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TRANSFERRING LIQUID METALS FROM A COLLECTION CONTAINER TO A RECEIVING CONTAINER | [2004/01] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRANSFERT DE METAUX LIQUIDES D'UN RECIPIENT COLLECTEUR DANS UN RECIPIENT RECEPTEUR | [2004/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2003 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 22.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.02.2006 | FI | 01.02.2006 | LU | 22.03.2006 | ES | 23.03.2006 | SE | 23.03.2006 | CH | 31.03.2006 | LI | 31.03.2006 | MC | 31.03.2006 | GR | 02.05.2006 | NL | 01.10.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
LU | 22.03.2006 | ||
ES | 23.03.2006 | ||
SE | 23.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
NL | 01.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
ES | 23.03.2006 | ||
SE | 23.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
NL | 01.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
ES | 23.03.2006 | ||
SE | 23.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
ES | 23.03.2006 | ||
SE | 23.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
SE | 23.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
SE | 23.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
NL | 01.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
SE | 23.03.2006 | ||
CH | 31.03.2006 | ||
LI | 31.03.2006 | ||
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
MC | 31.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.02.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]LU38361 (RUHRSTAHL AG) [A] 4,5 * page 3, line 1 - line 15; figure . *; | [A]GB1024953 (STANDARD MESSO DUISBURG) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]GB1087123 (STAL LAVAL APPARAT AB) [A] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1508119 (KRUPP GMBH) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US3826646 (HAMMARLUND P, et al) [A] 1-3,6 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 36; figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB1390636 (PROPERZI I) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-7 * |