EP1356189 - METHOD TO EVALUATE THE HYDROCARBON POTENTIAL OF SEDIMENTARY BASINS FROM FLUID INCLUSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Upstream Research Company P.O. Box 2189 Houston, TX 77252-2189 / US | [2003/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VITYK, Maxim, O. 415 Anacacho Drive Pearland, TX 77584 / US | 02 /
POTTORF, Robert, H. 1010 Memorial Village Drive Houston, TX 77024 / US | 03 /
CHIMENTI, Robert, J. 63 Great Hills Road Short Hills, NJ 07078 / US | 04 /
KALAMARAS, Patricia, H. 135 Little York-Pattenburg Road Milford, NJ 08848 / US | 05 /
BODNAR, Robert, J. 3343 Indian Meadow Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | 06 /
LENG, Jing 208 Cherokee Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Troch, Geneviève, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc., P.O. Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 02713376.8 | 09.01.2002 | [2003/44] | WO2002US00542 | Priority number, date | US20010265654P | 31.01.2001 Original published format: US 265654 P | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO02061239 | Date: | 08.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1356189 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1356189 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.08.2002 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/00, E21B47/06, E21B49/00 | [2005/16] | CPC: |
G01N33/241 (EP,US);
E21B49/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/44] | E21B47/00, E21B47/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG DES KOHLENWASSERSTOFFPOTENZIALS VON SEDIMENTBECKEN VON FLUIDEINSCHLÜSSEN | [2003/44] | English: | METHOD TO EVALUATE THE HYDROCARBON POTENTIAL OF SEDIMENTARY BASINS FROM FLUID INCLUSIONS | [2003/44] | French: | PROCEDE POUR EVALUER LES POTENTIELS D'HYDROCARBURE DE BASSINS SEDIMENTAIRES AU MOYEN DES INCLUSIONS FLUIDES | [2003/44] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2003 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2003 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 06.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2006 | BE | 13.12.2006 | CH | 13.12.2006 | CY | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | FI | 13.12.2006 | IT | 13.12.2006 | LI | 13.12.2006 | TR | 13.12.2006 | IE | 09.01.2007 | LU | 09.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | SE | 13.03.2007 | GR | 14.03.2007 | ES | 24.03.2007 | PT | 14.05.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
CY | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 09.01.2007 | ||
LU | 09.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 09.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 09.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
ES | 24.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IT | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
PT | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
BE | 13.12.2006 | ||
CH | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
LI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
SE | 13.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4916314 (SMITH MICHAEL P [US]) [A] 1-29* the whole document *; | [A]GB2256885 (AMOCO CORP [US]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5241859 (SMITH MICHAEL P [US]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5328849 (SMITH MICHAEL P [US]) [A] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [A]US5632336 (NOTZ PHILLIP K [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4109522 (THOMPSON DON D); | [A]US4783751 (EHRLICH ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US4791618 (PRUCHNIK PAUL R [US]) |