EP1350133 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A POLARIZATION BEAM COMBINER WITH AN INTEGRATED OPTICAL ISOLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/41] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A POLARIZATION BEAM SPLITTER/COMBINER WITH AN INTEGRATED OPTICAL ISOLATOR | ||
[2006/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Finisar Corporation 1308 Moffett Park Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states FINISAR CORPORATION 1308 Moffett Park Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Yonglin 518 Vista Spring Court Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 02 /
MA, Shuqing 1284 Quincy Drive, Apartment 5 San Jose, CA 95132 / US | 03 /
MA, Meng 4093 Lakecrest Court San Jose, CA 95148 / US | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2003/41] | Orr, William McLean Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, Tower House, Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 02713400.6 | 10.01.2002 | [2003/41] | WO2002US00901 | Priority number, date | US20010261179P | 10.01.2001 Original published format: US 261179 P | US20010900091 | 05.07.2001 Original published format: US 900091 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO02056093 | Date: | 18.07.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1350133 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2002 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350133 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/28 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
G02B27/283 (EP,US);
G02F1/093 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN POLARISIERENDEN STRAHLKOMBINIERER MIT INTEGRIERTEM OPTISCHEN ISOLATOR | [2006/13] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A POLARIZATION BEAM COMBINER WITH AN INTEGRATED OPTICAL ISOLATOR | [2006/13] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR UN MELANGEUR DE FAISCEAUX DE POLARISATION COMPORTANT UN ISOLATEUR OPTIQUE INTEGRE | [2006/13] |
Former [2003/41] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN POLARISIERENDEN STRAHLTEILER/-KOMBINIERER MIT INTEGRIERTEM OPTISCHEN ISOLATOR | ||
Former [2003/41] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A POLARIZATION BEAM SPLITTER/COMBINER WITH AN INTEGRATED OPTICAL ISOLATOR | ||
Former [2003/41] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR UN SEPARATEUR/MELANGEUR DE FAISCEAUX DE POLARISATION COMPORTANT UN ISOLATEUR OPTIQUE INTEGRE | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2003 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2003 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2003 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2002 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/41] | 07.08.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2006 | BE | 06.09.2006 | CH | 06.09.2006 | CY | 06.09.2006 | FI | 06.09.2006 | FR | 06.09.2006 | IT | 06.09.2006 | LI | 06.09.2006 | NL | 06.09.2006 | TR | 06.09.2006 | DK | 06.12.2006 | SE | 06.12.2006 | DE | 07.12.2006 | GR | 07.12.2006 | ES | 17.12.2006 | IE | 10.01.2007 | LU | 10.01.2007 | MC | 31.01.2007 | PT | 19.02.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/38] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
CY | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
FR | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
IE | 10.01.2007 | ||
LU | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
FR | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
IE | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
IE | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
GR | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
IE | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
IE | 10.01.2007 | ||
MC | 31.01.2007 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
IT | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
DK | 06.12.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
DE | 07.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
BE | 06.09.2006 | ||
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 06.09.2006 | |
CH | 06.09.2006 | ||
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
PT | 19.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
NL | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | CH | 06.09.2006 | |
FI | 06.09.2006 | ||
LI | 06.09.2006 | ||
SE | 06.12.2006 | ||
ES | 17.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS61130921 ; | [X]JPS60130934 ; | [X]JPH06113920 ; | [A]JPS59176721 ; | [X]US4548478 (SHIRASAKI MASATAKA [JP]) [X] 1-41 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 31; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0520199 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1,13,21,22,32* figure 8 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861105), vol. 010, no. 324, Database accession no. (P - 512), & JP61130921 A 19860618 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 1-41 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851119), vol. 009, no. 291, Database accession no. (E - 359), & JP60130934 A 19850712 (FUJITSU KK) [X] 1-41 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940725), vol. 018, no. 395, Database accession no. (C - 1229), & JP06113920 A 19940426 (HIROSHI FUKUBA) [X] 1-41 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850213), vol. 009, no. 033, Database accession no. (P - 334), & JP59176721 A 19841006 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 1,13,21,22,32 * abstract * |